Austin Design Inc. v. The Topps Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Austin Design Inc.
Defendant: The Topps Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00359
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant The Topps Company, Inc.. (Cole, Stacy)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Charles Greiner for Defendant The Topps Company, Inc. (Greiner, John)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to The Topps Company, Inc. on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Cole, Stacy)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacy A Cole for Defendant The Topps Company, Inc. (Cole, Stacy)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Topps Company, Inc. (eh)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Austin Design Inc. (eh)
May 15, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The Topps Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6924822), filed by Austin Design Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Form, #7 Affidavit) (Rousseau, Liane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin Design Inc. v. The Topps Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Topps Company, Inc.
Represented By: Stacy A Cole
Represented By: John Charles Greiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Design Inc.
Represented By: Karen Kreider Gaunt
Represented By: Jaci L. Overmann
Represented By: Michael Joseph Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?