Preterm-Cleveland et al v. Ohio Attorney General et al
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood of Greater Ohio, M.D. Sharon Liner, Capital Care Network of Toledo, Women's Med Group Professional Corporation, Preterm-Cleveland and Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region
Defendant: Hamilton County Prosecutor, Mahoning County Prosecutor, Franklin County Prosecutor, Supervising Member, State Medical Board, Secretary, State Medical Board of Ohio, Montgomery County Prosecutor, Cuyahoga County Prosecutor, Richland County Prosecutor, Director Ohio Department of Health, Lucas County Prosecutor and Attorney General of Ohio
Case Number: 1:2019cv00360
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; bond waived. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 7/3/19. (ba)
June 25, 2019 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Supervising Member, State Medical Board on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Hill, Beatrice)
June 25, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Secretary, State Medical Board of Ohio on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Hill, Beatrice)
June 25, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Director Ohio Department of Health on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Hill, Beatrice)
June 25, 2019 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Attorney General of Ohio on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Hill, Beatrice)
June 19, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Defendant Attorney General of Ohio re #21 Notice (Other), Notice of Defendant Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost Regarding County Prosecutors Notice (Buchanan, Heather)
June 19, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs Capital Care Network of Toledo, Sharon Liner, Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region, Planned Parenthood of Greater Ohio, Preterm-Cleveland, Women's Med Group Professional Corporation. (Hill, Beatrice)
June 13, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Barbiere for Defendant Hamilton County Prosecutor (Barbiere, James)
June 13, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Defendants Cuyahoga County Prosecutor, Franklin County Prosecutor, Hamilton County Prosecutor, Lucas County Prosecutor, Mahoning County Prosecutor, Montgomery County Prosecutor, Richland County Prosecutor Notice to Court Regarding Defense Provided By County Prosecutor Defendants (Sears, Pamela)
June 12, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Gerard Florez for Defendant Hamilton County Prosecutor (Florez, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela J Sears for Defendant Hamilton County Prosecutor (Sears, Pamela)
June 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur James Marziale, Jr for Defendant Franklin County Prosecutor (Marziale, Arthur)
June 5, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendants Attorney General of Ohio, Director Ohio Department of Health, Secretary, State Medical Board of Ohio, Supervising Member, State Medical Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A SB 23 Bill Analysis, #2 Exhibit B SB 23 Sponsor Testimony, #3 Exhibit C SB 23 Proponent Testimony-Dennis Sullivan MD, #4 Exhibit D SB 23 Testimony of K. Aultman, MD, #5 Exhibit E SB 23 Announcement of Committee Meeting, #6 Exhibit F SB 23 Proponent Testimony-David Forte) (Buchanan, Heather)
June 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget C Coontz for Defendants Attorney General of Ohio, Director Ohio Department of Health, Secretary, State Medical Board of Ohio, Supervising Member, State Medical Board (Coontz, Bridget)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth Watson, Rachel Reeves and Brigitte Amiri for Plaintiff Preterm-Cleveland. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 6/4/19. (ba)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Melissa Cohen and Richard Muniz for Plaintiffs Sharon Liner, Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region, Planned Parenthood of Greater Ohio. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 6/4/19. (ba)
June 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John A Borell, Sr and Kevin A Pituch for Defendant Lucas County Prosecutor (Borell, John) Modified on 6/3/2019 (jlw).
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $600 paid, receipt number 0648-6947719) of Elizabeth Watson, Rachel Reeves, Brigitte Amiri by Plaintiff Preterm-Cleveland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reeves Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Watson Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Amiri Certificate of Good Standing) (Levenson, Freda)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ward Coker Barrentine for Defendant Montgomery County Prosecutor (Barrentine, Ward)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 1:18cv109 are related, the subject case nevertheless will remain with the Judge to who it was assigned. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett and Judge Timothy S. Black on 5/17/19. (ba)
May 20, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 5/20/2019; Jennifer Branch, Beatrice Hill, Freda Levenson and Melissa Cohen appeared for Plaintiff; Elizabeth Watson appeared for Plf Preterm-Cleveland; Heather Buchanan and Bridgette Coontz appeared for Dft Ohio Attorney General; case to proceed with briefing re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; Order to follow. (ba) Modified on 5/22/2019 (ba) to correct the entry regarding appearance. A NEF will be regenerated. Modified on 6/5/2019 (ba) to edit text to correct attorney appearance.
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather L. Buchanan for Defendant Attorney General of Ohio (Buchanan, Heather)
May 15, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number 0648-6925980) of Melissa Cohen and Richard Muniz by Plaintiffs Capital Care Network of Toledo, Sharon Liner, Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region, Planned Parenthood of Greater Ohio, Women's Med Group Professional Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Melissa Cohen Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Richard Muniz Certificate of Good Standing) (Branch, Jennifer)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lynn Branch for Plaintiffs Capital Care Network of Toledo, Sharon Liner, Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region, Planned Parenthood of Greater Ohio, Women's Med Group Professional Corporation (Branch, Jennifer)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Freda J Levenson for Plaintiff Preterm-Cleveland (Levenson, Freda)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Beatrice Jessie Hill for Plaintiff Preterm-Cleveland (Hill, Beatrice)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Preterm-Cleveland. (Hill, Beatrice)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Capital Care Network of Toledo, Sharon Liner, Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region, Planned Parenthood of Greater Ohio, Preterm-Cleveland, Women's Med Group Professional Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Preliminary Injuction) (Hill, Beatrice). Added MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on 5/15/2019 (sct).
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6925711), filed by Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region, Preterm-Cleveland, Capital Care Network of Toledo, Sharon Liner, Planned Parenthood of Greater Ohio, Women's Med Group Professional Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - S.B. 23) (Hill, Beatrice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Preterm-Cleveland et al v. Ohio Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton County Prosecutor
Represented By: Pamela J Sears
Represented By: Michael Gerard Florez
Represented By: James J. Barbiere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahoning County Prosecutor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin County Prosecutor
Represented By: Arthur James Marziale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supervising Member, State Medical Board
Represented By: Heather L. Buchanan
Represented By: Bridget C Coontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, State Medical Board of Ohio
Represented By: Heather L. Buchanan
Represented By: Bridget C Coontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County Prosecutor
Represented By: Ward Coker Barrentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuyahoga County Prosecutor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richland County Prosecutor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Ohio Department of Health
Represented By: Heather L. Buchanan
Represented By: Bridget C Coontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas County Prosecutor
Represented By: John A Borell, Sr
Represented By: Kevin Andrew Pituch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of Ohio
Represented By: Bridget C Coontz
Represented By: Heather L. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood of Greater Ohio
Represented By: Alphonse Adam Gerhardstein
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Branch
Represented By: Richard Muniz
Represented By: Beatrice Jessie Hill
Represented By: Melissa A. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D. Sharon Liner
Represented By: Alphonse Adam Gerhardstein
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Branch
Represented By: Richard Muniz
Represented By: Beatrice Jessie Hill
Represented By: Melissa A. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital Care Network of Toledo
Represented By: Alphonse Adam Gerhardstein
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Branch
Represented By: Beatrice Jessie Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Women's Med Group Professional Corporation
Represented By: Alphonse Adam Gerhardstein
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Branch
Represented By: Beatrice Jessie Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preterm-Cleveland
Represented By: Freda J Levenson
Represented By: Beatrice Jessie Hill
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Watson
Represented By: Rachel M. Reeves
Represented By: Brigitte Amiri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region
Represented By: Alphonse Adam Gerhardstein
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Branch
Represented By: Richard Muniz
Represented By: Beatrice Jessie Hill
Represented By: Melissa A. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?