Truitt v. Kings Daughters Medical Center

Plaintiff: Amy Truitt
Defendant: Kings Daughters Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2019cv00378
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: The parties Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due to be filed with the Court by 8/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 7/19/2019. (art)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Kings Daughters Medical Center. (Hall, William)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Kings Daughters Medical Center on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Butler, Brian)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (vp)
May 22, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Kings Daughters Medical Center ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6933969), filed by Amy Truitt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue) (Butler, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truitt v. Kings Daughters Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Truitt
Represented By: Brian Joseph Butler
Represented By: Daniel J. Treadaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kings Daughters Medical Center
Represented By: William Mitchell Hall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?