Solis et al v. Emery Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: Marta Chaney, Edwin Solis, James Gilbert, Shanna Solis and Jeffrey Markle
Defendant: Emery Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 1:2019cv00387
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 #5 #6 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael P. Smith for Plaintiffs Marta Chaney, James Gilbert, Jeffrey Markle, Edwin Solis, Shanna Solis. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 6/6/19. (ba)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6954206) of Sarah A. Zadrozny by Plaintiffs Marta Chaney, James Gilbert, Jeffrey Markle, Edwin Solis, Shanna Solis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing) (Utter, Gregory)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6954193) of Melissa L. English by Plaintiffs Marta Chaney, James Gilbert, Jeffrey Markle, Edwin Solis, Shanna Solis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing) (Utter, Gregory)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6954128) of Michael P. Smith by Plaintiffs Marta Chaney, James Gilbert, Jeffrey Markle, Edwin Solis, Shanna Solis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing) (Utter, Gregory)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Emery Federal Credit Union on 5/28/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Utter, Gregory) Modified Waiver Sent Date on 5/30/2019 (bjc).
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Schaub Matthews for Plaintiffs Marta Chaney, James Gilbert, Jeffrey Markle, Edwin Solis, Shanna Solis (Matthews, Melissa)
May 28, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Emery Federal Credit Union ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6938517), filed by Edwin Solis, Jeffrey Markle, James Gilbert, Shanna Solis, Marta Chaney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - June 22, 2011 All Star Email, #2 Exhibit 2 - Emery White Marsh Branch Invoices and Payment Records, #3 Exhibit 3 - December 8, 2012 Emails between All Star and Emery, #4 Exhibit 4 - January 3, 2012 All Star Fee Spreadsheet, #5 Exhibit 5 - April 3, 2012 All Star Fee Spreadsheet, #6 Exhibit 6 - June 13, 2012 All Star Email to TitleHound, #7 Exhibit 7 - June 26, 2012 Jason Horwitz (All Star) Fee Sheet, #8 Exhibit 8 -October 10, 2012 All Star Email, #9 Exhibit 9 - December 5, 2012 All Star Email, #10 Exhibit 10 - January 13, 2014 All Star Title Fee Structure Chart, #11 Exhibit 11 - Emery Forest Hill Branch Invoices and Payment Records, #12 Exhibit 12 - January 26, 2012 March 5, 2013 Emails between All Star and Emery, #13 Exhibit 13 - October 2, 2012 Emails between All Star and Emery, #14 Exhibit 14 - July 24, 2012 Emails between All Star and Emery, #15 Exhibit 15 - Emery San Diego Branch Invoices and Payment Records, #16 Exhibit 16 - April 12, 2012 All Star Emails, #17 Exhibit 17 - April 18, 2013 Jason Horwitz (All Star) Fee Sheet, #18 Exhibit 18 - September 12, 2011 All Star Title Fee Structure Chart, #19 Exhibit 19 - June 25, 2013 Emails between All Star and Emery, #20 Exhibit 20 - July 19, 2012 All Star Email to TitleHound, #21 Exhibit 21 - May 21, 2012 All Star Fee Spreadsheet, #22 Exhibit 22 - Solis Plaintiffs HUD-1, #23 Exhibit 23 - Plaintiff Gilberts HUD-1, #24 Exhibit 24 - Plaintiff Chaneys HUD-1, #25 Exhibit 25 - June 2012 Emery White Marsh Branch Mailer, #26 Exhibit 26 - June 6, 2011 All Star Email, #27 Exhibit 27 - September 24, 2015 All Star Email, #28 Exhibit 28 - October 6, 2015 All Star Email, #29 Exhibit 29 - January 12, 2012 Emails between All Star and Emery, #30 Civil Cover Sheet) (Utter, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solis et al v. Emery Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marta Chaney
Represented By: Melissa Schaub Matthews
Represented By: Michael Paul Smith
Represented By: Gregory Michael Utter
Represented By: Melissa L. English
Represented By: Sarah A. Zadrozny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Solis
Represented By: Melissa Schaub Matthews
Represented By: Michael Paul Smith
Represented By: Gregory Michael Utter
Represented By: Melissa L. English
Represented By: Sarah A. Zadrozny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gilbert
Represented By: Melissa Schaub Matthews
Represented By: Michael Paul Smith
Represented By: Gregory Michael Utter
Represented By: Melissa L. English
Represented By: Sarah A. Zadrozny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanna Solis
Represented By: Melissa Schaub Matthews
Represented By: Michael Paul Smith
Represented By: Gregory Michael Utter
Represented By: Melissa L. English
Represented By: Sarah A. Zadrozny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Markle
Represented By: Melissa Schaub Matthews
Represented By: Michael Paul Smith
Represented By: Gregory Michael Utter
Represented By: Melissa L. English
Represented By: Sarah A. Zadrozny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emery Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?