Rotondo v. JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Plaintiff: Rotondo Derek and Derek Rotondo
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00408
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Intra District Transfer - Case transferred to Eastern at Columbus as case number 2:19cv2328. This case has been closed and all future filings should be made in case number 2:19cv2328. (eh)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - This case is hereby TRANSFERRED from the docket of The Honorable Susan J. Dlott to the Clerk of this Court for reassignment in the Eastern Division in Columbus. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 6/3/2019. (eh) Modified docket text on 6/4/2019 (sct).
June 3, 2019 Notice of Correction: Please disregard [FORMER DOC. 8] - filed using incorrect ECF event in error. (eh)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 [FORMER DOC. 8 - PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR]. ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 6/3/2019. Case reassigned to Judge William O. Bertelsman for all further proceedings. Judge Susan J. Dlott no longer assigned to case. (eh) Modified docket text and document security on 6/3/2019 (eh).
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER transferring the case from the docket of the Hon. Michael R. Barrett to the Clerks Office for reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Susan J. Dlott for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 5/31/19. (sct)
May 31, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6944755) of Pooja Shethji by Plaintiff Rotondo Derek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Levenson, Freda)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6944722) of Deirdre Aaron by Plaintiff Rotondo Derek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Levenson, Freda)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6944705) of Peter Romer-Friedman by Plaintiff Rotondo Derek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Levenson, Freda)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6944640) of Galen Sherwin by Plaintiff Rotondo Derek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Levenson, Freda)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Conditional Certification of the Settlement Class, Appointment of Plaintiff's Counsel as Class Counsel, and Approval of the Proposed Notice of Settlement and Class Action Settlement Procedure and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Rotondo Derek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Romer-Friedman Declaration with Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Sherwin Declaration, #3 Exhibit Wickersham Declaration with Exhibits) (Levenson, Freda). Added MOTION to Certify Class, MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Settlement on 5/31/2019 (eh).
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6944481), filed by Rotondo Derek. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Levenson, Freda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rotondo v. JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rotondo Derek
Represented By: Freda J Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Rotondo
Represented By: Freda J Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?