Zimmer v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Hans M. Zimmer
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00409
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas John Pantel for Defendant United States of America (Pantel, Nicholas)
June 3, 2019 Notice of Correction: Please disregard [FORMER DOC. 4] Order Reassigning Case - filed in error by clerk. See doc. #5 for corrected filing.
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 6/3/2019. (eh)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 [FORMER DOC. 4 - PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR.] ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 6/3/2019. Case reassigned to Judge Michael R. Barrett for all further proceedings. Judge Susan J. Dlott no longer assigned to case. (eh) Modified docket text on 6/3/2019 (eh).
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America/IRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (eh) Modified on 5/31/2019 (eh).
May 31, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 100CIN036863 (eh)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $ 400 paid), filed by Hans M. Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Caylor, Lydia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimmer v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hans M. Zimmer
Represented By: Lydia Allen Caylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Nicholas John Pantel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?