The Gillette Company LLC v. Computer Recycling LLC

Plaintiff: The Gillette Company LLC
Defendant: Computer Recycling LLC, DBA GoodWorldDeals.com and Computer Recycling LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00419
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Notation Order: This civil action is before the Court on Defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. (Doc. 7). For good cause shown, that motion (Doc. 7) is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 8/13/19. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/15/19. (rrs)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 8/13/2019. by Defendant Computer Recycling LLC. (Rawlin, Dustin)
June 21, 2019 Reset Deadlines per doc. #6 : Computer Recycling LLC answer due 7/16/2019. (eh)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION (Joint) for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead per LR 6.1 by Defendant Computer Recycling LLC. (Rawlin, Dustin)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Dustin B Rawlin for Defendant Computer Recycling LLC (Rawlin, Dustin)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. Judge Michael R. Barrett no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 6/13/19. (ba)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Computer Recycling LLC. Computer Recycling LLC served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Gaunt, Karen)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Computer Recycling LLC. (sct)
June 4, 2019 ***If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (sct)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Computer Recycling LLC, DBA GoodWorldDeals.com ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6949265), filed by The Gillette Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Affidavit, #10 Summons Form) (Gaunt, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Gillette Company LLC v. Computer Recycling LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Gillette Company LLC
Represented By: Karen Kreider Gaunt
Represented By: Ashley Earle
Represented By: Govinda Mirabai Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Computer Recycling LLC, DBA GoodWorldDeals.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Computer Recycling LLC
Represented By: Dustin B Rawlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?