Consolidated Insurance Company v. Evans et al
Plaintiff: Consolidated Insurance Company
Defendant: Ethan Evans, Brian Dick, Dylan Cox Eastham, Leslie Evans, Kelly Bradley, Clinton Evans, Jeffrey Clifton, Jamie Bradley, Nickol Dick, David Evans, 1st Stop, Inc. and Jamie Bradley as next friend of M.B., a minor
Case Number: 1:2019cv00426
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 17 Combined ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, of Defendants 1st Stop, Inc. dba Georgetown 1st Stop and Jeffrey Clifton to Consolidated Insurance Company's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed by 1st Stop, Inc., Jeffrey Clifton. (Saxton, Jonathan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Dylan Cox Eastham. (Rich, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Jamie Bradley, Kelly Bradley, Jamie Bradley as next friend of M.B., a minor. (Moore, Daniel)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Nickol Dick on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Harter, William)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Brian Dick on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Harter, William)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Leslie Evans on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Harter, William)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Ethan Evans on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Harter, William)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to David Evans on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Harter, William)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Clinton Evans on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Harter, William)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Dylan Cox Eastham on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Harter, William)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Jeffrey Clifton on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Harter, William)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to 1st Stop, Inc. on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Harter, William)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Jamie Bradley as next friend of M.B., a minor on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Harter, William)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Jamie Bradley on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Harter, William)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Kelly Bradley on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Harter, William)
June 5, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Consolidated Insurance Company. (Harter, William)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6953972), filed by Consolidated Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit List of defense attorneys., #3 Exhibit Underlying Complaint, #4 Exhibit DFs' Dick's Cross-claims, #5 Exhibit Df Eastham's Crossclaims, #6 Exhibit Df Clifton's Crossclaims, #7 Exhibit Df 1st Stop's Crossclaims, #8 Exhibit Certified Policy, #9 Exhibit ROR Letter) (Harter, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Consolidated Insurance Company v. Evans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethan Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Dick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan Cox Eastham
Represented By: David E Rich
Represented By: Perry W Oxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Bradley
Represented By: Daniel N Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Clifton
Represented By: Jessica L. Worth
Represented By: Jonathan P Saxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Bradley
Represented By: Daniel N Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nickol Dick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1st Stop, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica L. Worth
Represented By: Jonathan P Saxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Bradley as next friend of M.B., a minor
Represented By: Daniel N Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consolidated Insurance Company
Represented By: Meagan Woodall
Represented By: William M Harter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?