Dates v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. et al
Appellant: Carlean Dates
Interested Party: U S Bankruptcy Court - Cincinnati
Appellee: HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and John D. Clunk
Case Number: 1:2019cv00446
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Timothy S Black
2 Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 Appellant's BRIEF by Appellant Carlean Dates. (eh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Certification of Record on Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 7/30/2019. Appellee Brief due by 8/13/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 8/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 1 Petition, #2 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 2 Notice of Reassignment of Judge, #3 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 4 Form 1015-2, #4 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 5 Verification of Creditor Matrix, #5 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 6 Credit Counseling Certification, #6 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 7 Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments, #7 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 8 Order of Deficiency, #8 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 9 Notice to Debtor, #9 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 10 BNC Mailing, #10 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 11 BNC Mailing, #11 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 12 BNC Mailing, #12 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 13 Notice of Meeting of Creditors, #13 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 14 BNC Mailing, #14 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 15 Notice of Appearance, #15 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 16 Motion to Dismiss, #16 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 17 Order to Pay Filing Fee in Installments, #17 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 18 Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs, #18 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 19 Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income, #19 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 20 Chapter 13 Plan, #20 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 21 BNC Mailing, #21 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 22 Notice of Overdue Installment Payment, #22 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 23 BNC Mailing, #23 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 24 Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss, #24 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 25 Objection to Motion to Dismiss, #25 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 26 Trustee's Chapter 13 Recommendation, #26 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 27 Objection to Confirmation, #27 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 28 Notice of Overdue Installment Payment, #28 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 29 BNC Mailing, #29 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 30 Notice of Rejection of Purported Appointment, #30 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 32 Notice to Convert to Chapter 7, #31 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 33 Notice of Meeting of Creditors, #32 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 34 Chapter 13 Trustee's Certification, #33 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 35 Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report, #34 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 36 BNC Mailing, #35 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 37 Statement of Intent, #36 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 38 Declaration of Debtor's Schedules, #37 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 39 Notice of Appearance, #38 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 40 Notice of Overdue Installment Payment, #39 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 41 BNC Mailing, #40 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 45 Report to Court, #41 BK 18-14602, Doc. # 46 Trustees Interim Report, #42 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 1 Complaint, #43 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 2 Summons, #44 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 3 Summons, #45 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 4 Adv Coversheet, #46 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 5 Motion to Dismiss, #47 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 6 Notice, #48 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 7 Motion to Dismiss, #49 AP 19-1011, Doc. # Notice of Filing Motion to Dismiss, #50 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 9 Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss, #51 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 10 Motion to Dismiss, #52 AP 19-1011, Doc. # Notice of Motion to Dismiss, #53 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 12 Notice, #54 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 13 Notice, #55 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 14 Notice, #56 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 15 Notice, #57 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 16 Response, #58 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 17 Motion for Protective Order, #59 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 18 Notice, #60 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 19 Order, #61 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 20 Order, #62 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 21 Order, #63 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 22 BNC Mailing, #64 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 23 Order, #65 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 24 BNC Mailing, #66 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 25 Affidavit, #67 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 26 Affidavit, #68 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 27 Affidavit, #69 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 28 Memorandum Decision, #70 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 29 Order, #71 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 30 BNC Mailing, #72 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 31 BNC Mailing, #73 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 32 Notice of Appeal, #74 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 34 Notice of Appeal, #75 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 35 Appellant Designation, #76 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 36 Transmission of Appeal, #77 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 37 Transmission to District Court, #78 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 38 Transmission of Appeal, #79 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 39 Transmittal to District Court, #80 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 40 Temporary Restraining Order, #81 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 41 Affidavit, #82 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 42 Affidavit, #83 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 43 BNC Mailing, #84 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 44 BNC Mailing, #85 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 45 Order, #86 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 46 Order, #87 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 47 BNC Mailing, #88 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 48 BNC Mailing, #89 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 51 Notice, #90 AP 19-1011, Doc. # 52 Notice) (sct)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that case numbers 1:19cv445, 1:19cv446, 1:17cv535, 1:17cv634, and 1:17cv842 ARE related. Case No. 1:19cv446 reassigned to Judge Black. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett and Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/19/2019. (eh)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Carlean Dates. The parties briefing schedule will be established once the District Court receives the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Certification of Record on Appeal. Bankruptcy Court case number 1:18-bk-14602. (Attachments: #1 Order (Doc. 29), #2 Transmittal Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Docket Sheet) (sct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dates v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Carlean Dates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U S Bankruptcy Court - Cincinnati
Represented By: US Bankruptcy Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: LeAnn E Covey
Represented By: David A Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John D. Clunk
Represented By: LeAnn E Covey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?