K2 Industrial Controls International, Ltd. v. Kuehne + Nagel, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: K2 Industrial Controls International, Ltd.
Defendant: Kuehne + Nagel, Inc. and The Expediting Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00449
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction New date requested 8/28/2019. by Plaintiff K2 Industrial Controls International, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Murray, Kyle)
July 31, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for More Definite Statement. Responses due by 8/28/2019 (jlw)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff K2 Industrial Controls International, Ltd. shall have up to and including August 28, 2019 within which to respond to Defendant's motion for more definite statement. Defendant The Expediting company, Inc. shall have up to and including August 28, 2019 within which to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 7/31/2019. (jlw)
July 29, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, #3 MOTION for More Definite Statement New date requested 8/28/2019. , Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 8/28/2019. by Defendant The Expediting Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Huggins, Emily)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer The Expediting Company, Inc. answer due 7/29/2019.; granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #3 MOTION for More Definite Statement ( Responses due by 7/29/2019). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 07/23/2019. (bjc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Kuehne Nagel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kimberly Long, #2 Exhibit Credit Application Form, #3 Exhibit Invoices, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Kennedy, Katherine)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, #3 MOTION for More Definite Statement New date requested 7/29/2019. , Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 7/29/2019. by Defendant The Expediting Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Huggins, Emily)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AGREED ORDER ON THE PARTIES' JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 7/10/2019. Plaintiff K2 Industrial Controls International, Ltd. shall have up to and including July 19, 2019 within which to respond to Defendant's #3 MOTION for More Definite Statement. Defendant The Expediting company, Inc. shall have up to and including July 19, 2019 within which to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. (eh)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, #3 MOTION for More Definite Statement New date requested 7/19/2019. , Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 7/19/2019. by Defendant The Expediting Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rathke, Sarah)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint, Kuehne Nagel, Inc. answer due 7/19/2019. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 07/08/2019. (bjc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, New date requested 7/19/2019. by Defendant Kuehne Nagel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kennedy, Katherine)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #3 MOTION for More Definite Statement. Responses due by 7/10/2019. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 7/1/2019. (eh)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION for More Definite Statement New date requested 7/10/2019. by Plaintiff K2 Industrial Controls International, Ltd.. (Murray, Kyle)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Kuehne Nagel, Inc. answer due 7/5/2019.. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 06/21/2019. (bjc)
June 21, 2019 Set Deadlines per doc. #7 : The Expediting Company, Inc. answer due 7/10/2019. (eh)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, New date requested 7/5/2019. by Defendant Kuehne Nagel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kennedy, Katherine)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Lynn Kennedy for Defendant Kuehne Nagel, Inc. (Kennedy, Katherine)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Defendant The Expediting Company, Inc.'s Time to Answer Complaint until July 10, 2019 by Defendant The Expediting Company, Inc.. (Rathke, Sarah)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant The Expediting Company, Inc.. (Rathke, Sarah)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Andrew R. Spector. (sct)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Andrew Ferguson. (eh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for More Definite Statement originally filed 6/5/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902030) by Defendant The Expediting Company, Inc. (eh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 4/25/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902030) by K2 Industrial Controls International, Ltd. against Kuehne Nagel, Inc., The Expediting Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (eh)
June 13, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Common Pleas, case number A 1902030 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6964535), filed by The Expediting Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Filings, #2 Exhibit B - Consent to Removal from KN, #3 Civil Cover Sheet w/ Attachment, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet w/ Attachment) (Rathke, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K2 Industrial Controls International, Ltd. v. Kuehne + Nagel, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuehne + Nagel, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Lynn Kennedy
Represented By: Andrew R Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Expediting Company, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Kathryn Rathke
Represented By: John D. Lazzaretti
Represented By: Emily S Huggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K2 Industrial Controls International, Ltd.
Represented By: Kyle D Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?