Huber v. Bates et al
Plaintiff: Joseph A. Huber
Defendant: Correction Officer Macarthur Bates, Sgt. McCorski, Larry Greene, Sgt. Throckmorton, C/O Keating, CO Harris, Sgt. John Doe and Nurse John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00473
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Joseph A. Huber. (bjc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2019: #1 Affidavit) (bjc).
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Harris, Keating and sent to the Marshals for service along with copies of the complaint, USM-285 Forms, the Order issued granting the plaintiff in forma pauperis status, the show cause Order being issued this date, and the Order and Report and Recommendation. (bjc)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause in writing within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order why this case should not be consolidated with Case No. I 9-cv-224 under Rule 42(a) of the Federal Rules of CivilProcedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 07/29/2019. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs claims against defendant Bates, with the exception of plaintiffs dueprocess claim, and plaintiffs claims against defendants Throckmorton and "Nurse Jane Doe" be SEVERED and DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Fed. R. Civ. P. 21. 2. Plaintiffs claims against defendants McCorski and Greene, and plaintiffs due process claim against defendant Bates, be DISMISSED with prejudice. 28 U.S.C. l 915(e)(2)(8) and 191 SA(b)(l). 3. The Court certify pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(8) that for the foregoing reasons an appeal of any Order adopting this Report and Recommendation would not be taken in good faith, and therefore, deny plaintiff leave to appeal informa pauperis. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: 1. The United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint, summons, the separate Order issued granting the plaintiff in forma pauperis status, the separate show cause Order being issued this date, and this Order and Report and Recommendation upon defendants Keating and Harris. 2. Plaintiff shall serve upon defendants or, if appearance has been entered by counsel, upon counsel, a copy of every further pleading or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. 3. Plaintiff shall inform the Court promptly of any changes in his address which may occur during the pendency of this lawsuit.( Objections to R&R due by 8/13/2019). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 07/29/2019. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Joseph A. Huber. (bjc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Macarthur Bates, John Doe, Larry Greene, Harris, Keating, McCorski, Throckmorton, filed by Joseph A. Huber. (bjc)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 07/29/2019. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Service copies/summons forms for all defendants received.) by Plaintiff Joseph A. Huber. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel) (bjc) Modified docket text on 7/10/2019 (eh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huber v. Bates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer Macarthur Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. McCorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Throckmorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph A. Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?