Doe 1 et al v. City Of Cincinnati et al
Plaintiff: Detective John Doe 2, Officer John Doe 1, John Doe 2 and John Doe 1
Defendant: Brian Shrive, Binary Intelligence, City Of Cincinnati and Binary Intelligence, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00475
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Binary Intelligence, LLC. (Webber, Adam)
August 13, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Brian Shrive on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Kinsley, Jennifer)
July 15, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R Webber for Defendant Binary Intelligence, LLC (Webber, Adam)
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER Granting Temporary restraining Order by Plaintiffs John Doe 1, John Doe 2 re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Kinsley, Jennifer) Modified Docket Text on 7/5/2019 (bjc).
July 3, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to City Of Cincinnati on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Kinsley, Jennifer)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Defendant City Of Cincinnati re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion of Additional Authority (Woerner, Emily)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Binary Intelligence, LLC on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Kinsley, Jennifer)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Motion Hearing held on 7/2/2019 re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 2; counsel present; arguments heard; order to follow. (Court Reporter: Maryann Maffia) (ba)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendant City Of Cincinnati. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Woerner, Emily)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Second Declaration of Jennifer Kinsley by Plaintiffs John Doe 1, John Doe 2. (Kinsley, Jennifer)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order of Jane Roe Two by Plaintiffs John Doe 1, John Doe 2. (Kinsley, Jennifer)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order of Jennifer Kinsley by Plaintiffs John Doe 1, John Doe 2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Screen Captures from Finney Law Firm Website) (Kinsley, Jennifer)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Joint MOTION for Order to Direct Plaintiffs to Reveal the Identities of PLaintiffs John Doe 1 and John Doe 2 filed by Plaintiffs John Doe 1, John Doe 2. (Kinsley, Jennifer)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Flora Young by Plaintiffs John Doe 1, John Doe 2. (Kinsley, Jennifer)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order of Jane Roe by Plaintiffs John Doe 1, John Doe 2. (Kinsley, Jennifer)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Order to Direct Plaintiffs to Reveal the Identities of PLaintiffs John Doe 1 and John Doe 2 by Defendants City Of Cincinnati, Brian Shrive. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint for Injunctive Relief Pursuant to R.C. 121.22, State ex rel. Miller v. Sittenfeld, Hamilton County Common Pleas Case No. A-18-01934, #2 Exhibit B - Entry Overruling Defendants Motion for Protective Order, State ex rel. Miller v. Sittenfeld, Hamilton County Common Pleas Case No. A-18-01934) (Hartman, Curt)
June 28, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order; Please be aware that a Motion Hearing is set for 7/2/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 109 - Cincinnati before Judge Michael R. Barrett. (ba)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs John Doe 1, John Doe 2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of John Doe 1) (Kinsley, Jennifer)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Stackpole for Defendant City Of Cincinnati (Stackpole, Peter)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily E Woerner for Defendant City Of Cincinnati (Woerner, Emily)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiffs John Doe 1, John Doe 2 Civil cover sheet (Kinsley, Jennifer)
June 25, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Curt Carl Hartman for Defendant Brian Shrive (Hartman, Curt)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory, Injunctive, and Monetary Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6980341), filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 2. (Kinsley, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe 1 et al v. City Of Cincinnati et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Shrive
Represented By: Curt Carl Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Binary Intelligence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Cincinnati
Represented By: Peter J Stackpole
Represented By: Emily E Woerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Binary Intelligence, LLC
Represented By: Adam R Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Detective John Doe 2
Represented By: Jennifer M Kinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Officer John Doe 1
Represented By: Jennifer M Kinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 2
Represented By: Jennifer M Kinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 1
Represented By: Jennifer M Kinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?