Grubb v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Abbie L. Grubb
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00485
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (eh)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Farrell, Clifford)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Farrell, Clifford)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ameenah Lewis for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Lewis, Ameenah)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Farrell, Clifford)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Sent to the US Marshal for service with USM-285 forms and copies of the Complaint and Order for service. (eh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Abbie L. Grubb against Commissioner of Social Security. (eh)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and hereby authorizing commencement of this action without prepayment of fess or costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 7/1/2019. (eh) Modified on 7/1/2019 (eh).
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Plaintiff to complete service) by Plaintiff Abbie L. Grubb. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Summons Form Attorney General, #4 Summons Form US Attorney, #5 Summons Form Regional Counsel) (Farrell, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grubb v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abbie L. Grubb
Represented By: Clifford Michael Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ameenah Lewis
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?