Erickson v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Plaintiff: Lena J Erickson
Defendant: Merck, Sharpe, & Dohme Corporation, Wyeth-Ayerst Laboratories, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited, AstraZeneca LP, Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc., Wyeth LLC, Novartis Consumer Health, Inc., Pfizer Inc, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis AG, GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., Novartis Corporation, Takeda Development Center Americas Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Wyeth-Ayerst Laboratories Company, The Procter & Gamble Company, Merck & Co., Inc. and The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00509
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER transferring case to District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 7/10/2019. (ss)
July 10, 2019 Case transferred to District of New Jersey.Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (ss)
July 10, 2019 Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 2:19-cv-14982, filed 07/10/2019. (sct)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Serger Prem for Defendants The Procter & Gamble Company, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company (Prem, Emily)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay the Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by Defendants AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Merck & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Notice of Potential Tag-Along Actions) (Anderson, Daniel)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Alexander Pitcairn, Jr for Defendants Pfizer Inc, Wyeth LLC, Wyeth-Ayerst Laboratories Company (Pitcairn, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC, Novartis Consumer Health, Inc.. (Woodside, Frank)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint, #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 12/31/2019. by Defendants Pfizer Inc, Wyeth LLC, Wyeth-Ayerst Laboratories Company. (O'Shea, Peter)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Takeda Development Center Americas Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Brunton, Gregory)
July 9, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by Defendants AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Merck & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Anderson, Daniel) Modified docket text on 7/9/2019 (sct).
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M Anderson for Defendants AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Merck & Co., Inc. (Anderson, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina S. Dahmann for Defendants AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Merck & Co., Inc. (Dahmann, Kristina)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 5/31/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902653) by Lena J Erickson against All Defendants. (eh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Merck, Sharpe, & Dohme Corporation, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation for Merck, Sharpe, & Dohme Corporation.. (Anderson, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP; Corporate Parent AstraZeneca LP for AstraZeneca LP.. (Anderson, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Common Pleas, case number A1902653 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6993309), filed by Merck, Sharpe, & Dohme Corporation, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, AstraZeneca LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B- MDL Order, #3 Exhibit C- Tolling Agreement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Anderson, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erickson v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck, Sharpe, & Dohme Corporation
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth-Ayerst Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca LP
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth LLC
Represented By: Peter J. O'Shea
Represented By: Robert Alexander Pitcairn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Consumer Health, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas J Feichtner
Represented By: Frank Chester Woodside, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Peter J. O'Shea
Represented By: Robert Alexander Pitcairn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC
Represented By: Douglas J Feichtner
Represented By: Frank Chester Woodside, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Development Center Americas Inc.
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth-Ayerst Laboratories Company
Represented By: Peter J. O'Shea
Represented By: Robert Alexander Pitcairn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Daniel Geoppinger
Represented By: Emily Serger Prem
Represented By: Gina Marie Saelinger
Represented By: Kerry Carson Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Daniel Geoppinger
Represented By: Emily Serger Prem
Represented By: Gina Marie Saelinger
Represented By: Kerry Carson Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena J Erickson
Represented By: John D. Holschuh, III
Represented By: John David Holschuh, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?