Hall v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Plaintiff: Wesley Hall
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Wyeth-Ayerst Laboratories, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme, AstraZeneca LP, Takeda Development Center Americas Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Ltd, Wyeth LLC, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Merck & Co., Inc., The Procter & Gamble Company and The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00514
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 2:19-cv-15049, filed 07/11/2019. (sct)
July 10, 2019 Case transferred to District of New Jersey.Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (ss)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER transferring case to District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 7/10/2019. (ss)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Serger Prem for Defendants The Procter & Gamble Company, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company (Prem, Emily)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay the Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by Defendants AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Merck & Co., Inc.. (Anderson, Daniel)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Takeda Development Center Americas Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Ltd, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Brunton, Gregory)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Brunton, Gregory)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Merck & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dahmann, Kristina) Modified docket text on 7/9/2019 (sct).
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lydia Reback for Defendants AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Merck & Co., Inc. (Reback, Lydia)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M Anderson for Defendants AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Merck & Co., Inc. (Anderson, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 5/31/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902642) by Wesley Hall against All Defendants. (eh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Merck Sharp & Dohme, Merck & Co Inc identifying Corporate Parent Merck & Co Inc for Merck Sharp & Dohme.. (Dahmann, Kristina)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, AstraZeneca PLC, AstraZeneca PLC identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP.. (Dahmann, Kristina)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A 1902642 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6993458), filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, AstraZeneca LP, Merck Sharp & Dohme. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B-MRL Order, #3 Exhibit C-Tolling Agreement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Dahmann, Kristina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth-Ayerst Laboratories
Represented By: Peter J. O'Shea
Represented By: Robert Alexander Pitcairn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck Sharp & Dohme
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca LP
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Development Center Americas Inc.
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Ltd
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth LLC
Represented By: Peter J. O'Shea
Represented By: Robert Alexander Pitcairn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Daniel Geoppinger
Represented By: Emily Serger Prem
Represented By: Gina Marie Saelinger
Represented By: Kerry Carson Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Daniel Geoppinger
Represented By: Emily Serger Prem
Represented By: Gina Marie Saelinger
Represented By: Kerry Carson Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Hall
Represented By: John D. Holschuh, III
Represented By: John David Holschuh, Jr
Represented By: Brian Patrick O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?