Baugh v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Plaintiff: Kinnie Baugh
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Takeda Development Center Americas Inc., AstraZeneca LP, Pfizer Inc, The Procter & Gamble Company, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., The Procter & Gamble Distributing LLC, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company, Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP and Merck & Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00528
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 2:19-cv-15077, filed 07/11/2019. (sct)
July 10, 2019 Case transferred to District of New Jersey.Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (ss)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER transferring case to District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 7/10/2019. (ss)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Alexander Pitcairn, Jr for Defendant Pfizer Inc (Pitcairn, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Serger Prem for Defendants The Procter & Gamble Company, The Procter & Gamble Distributing LLC, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company (Prem, Emily)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by Defendants AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Merck & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Potential Tag Along) (Reback, Lydia)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 First MOTION for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint New date requested 12/31/2019. by Defendant Pfizer Inc. (O'Shea, Peter)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Brunton, Gregory)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by Defendants AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Merck & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Reback, Lydia)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Takeda Development Center Americas Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Brunton, Gregory)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lydia Reback for Defendants AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Merck & Co., Inc. (Reback, Lydia)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M Anderson for Defendants AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Merck & Co., Inc. (Anderson, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Abbott Laboratories, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Merck & Co., Inc., Pfizer Inc, Takeda Development Center Americas Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Procter & Gamble Company, The Procter & Gamble Distributing LLC, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company, filed by Kinnie Baugh in the Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas case A1902635. (bjc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, Merck & Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Merck & Co., Inc. for Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation.. (Reback, Lydia)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, AstraZeneca PLC, AstraZeneca PLC identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP.. (Reback, Lydia)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Common Pleas, case number A 1902635 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6994126), filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, AstraZeneca LP, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state court record, #2 Exhibit B - MDL Order, #3 Exhibit C - Tolling Agreement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Reback, Lydia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baugh v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Development Center Americas Inc.
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca LP
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Peter J. O'Shea
Represented By: Robert Alexander Pitcairn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Company
Represented By: Emily Serger Prem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Distributing LLC
Represented By: Emily Serger Prem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Emily Serger Prem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinnie Baugh
Represented By: John D. Holschuh, III
Represented By: John David Holschuh, Jr
Represented By: Brian Patrick O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?