Shipmon v. Eyemed Vision Care LLC
Plaintiff: Deloise Shipmon
Defendant: Eyemed Vision Care LLC d/b/a Luxottica and Eyemed Vision Care LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00559
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Notation Order: This case is before the Court on the parties' Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration. #3 . For good cause shown, that motion #3 is GRANTED. This case is STAYED pending the outcome of the parties' arbitration. On or before 11/29/19, the parties shall jointly notify the Court via email to Chambers (black_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov) of the status of this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 8/29/19. (rrs)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration by Defendant Eyemed Vision Care LLC. (Bond, Kasey)
August 8, 2019 Set Deadlines per doc. #2 : Eyemed Vision Care LLC answer due 8/27/2019. (eh)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 STIPULATION for Extension by Defendant Eyemed Vision Care LLC. (Milligan, John)
July 11, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Eyemed Vision Care LLC d/b/a Luxottica ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7002621), filed by Deloise Shipmon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Imm, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shipmon v. Eyemed Vision Care LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eyemed Vision Care LLC d/b/a Luxottica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eyemed Vision Care LLC
Represented By: Kasey L Bond
Represented By: John M. Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deloise Shipmon
Represented By: Stephen E Imm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?