Artisan Estate Homes, LLC v. Hensley Custom Building Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Artisan Estate Homes, LLC
Defendant: Bradford T. Osborne, Studer Residential Designs, Inc., Hensley Custom Building Group, LLC and Wendy S. Osborne
Case Number: 1:2019cv00566
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Bradford T. Osborne on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/23/2019; Wendy S. Osborne on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Goldenberg, Jeffrey)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Studer Residential Designs, Inc. on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Goldenberg, Jeffrey)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Hensley Custom Building Group, LLC on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Goldenberg, Jeffrey)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan M. Weirich. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/29/2019. (eh)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Floyd S. Yarnell. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/29/2019. (eh)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7022376) of Jonathan M. Weirich by Plaintiff Artisan Estate Homes, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Goldenberg, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7022356) of Floyd S. Yarnell by Plaintiff Artisan Estate Homes, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Goldenberg, Jeffrey)
July 12, 2019 ***If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (sct)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Hensley Custom Building Group, LLC, Bradford T. Osborne, Wendy S. Osborne, Studer Residential Designs, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7005637), filed by Artisan Estate Homes, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Floor Plans, #2 Exhibit 2: Certificates of Registration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goldenberg, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Artisan Estate Homes, LLC v. Hensley Custom Building Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradford T. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Studer Residential Designs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hensley Custom Building Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy S. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artisan Estate Homes, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Goldenberg
Represented By: Jonathan M. Weirich
Represented By: Floyd S. Yarnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?