Rogers v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Richard Rogers
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00585
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 8/20/19. (ba)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed via US Marshal as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (eh)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Ochoa, Susana)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Susana Ochoa for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Ochoa, Susana)
August 5, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 10/1/2019. (bjc)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 08/02/2019, answer due 10/01/2019. (Rake, Michael) Modified Dates on 8/5/2019 (bjc).
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and sent to the U.S. Marshals for service along with USM-285 Forms, copies of the complaint, and copies of the order issuing service. (bjc)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Richard Rogers. (bjc)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 07/24/2019. (bjc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Richard Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form) (Rake, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Rogers
Represented By: Michael A Rake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Susana Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?