Aaron et al v. United States of America, Department Of Health Of Human Services
Plaintiff: Arlene Fait, Roger Johnson, Clara Tubbs-Hill, Kathleen Teslcher, Christopher Atwood, Joseph Schimmel, Darlene Sterling, Karen Sisson, Debbie Rodriguez, Sandra Lemmel, Mary Gerbus, Kristine Dority, William Dabney, Connie Underwood, Kelly Williams, Ryan Hensley, Paul Wilson, James Albers, Jean Fenner, Larry Krech, Judy Young, Kerry McNeal, Karen Higginbothan, Tonia McQueary, Leona Beyer, Michael Collins, Ollie Deaton, Wayne Hatfield, Doug Callahan, Deborah Sturdivant, Theresa Robbinson-Woods, Michael Watkins, Frieda Aaron, Courtney Hammons, Randy Brewer, Dorothy Rose, Shelia Pogue Krabacher, David Smith, Melvin James, Cathy Holley, Elsa Ieraci, Shannon Koehler, Kimberly Bates, Malika Bonner, Tempie Stephenson, Jenny Grimm, Michael Brophy, Thomas Augst, Sandra Couch, Judy Beck, Calvin Brown, Lisa Conley, Joseph Wilder, Jack Buskirk, Candi McKinney, Tammie Little, Laura Batsche, Teresa McMillen, Joi Crowe, Terry Beil, Gary Coots, Douglas Hayes, Richard Lozier, Valerie Reeves, Edythe Bishop, Patrick Stephenson, Sherri Allen, Katie Lehmkuhl, Dawn Lee Ann Brown, David Fisher, Robin Schiller, Ciera Barr, Violet Whalen, Richard Stanfield, Harry Reynolds, Danielle Reed, Lonnie Wheeler, Christina Goldstein, Latoya Bradshaw, Robert Moore, Mark McMurren, Paula Wilson, Donald Moore, Nancy Pfetsch, Vicki Buschur, Dawn Wingert, Robert Wilson, Susan Griffin, Christina Brashear, Elizabeth Compo, Brenda Errgang, Chris Scheper, Christopher McCaughey, Rhonda Scott, Michael Cook, Sandra Dennis, Cathy Beil, Kelly Hennessy, Sophia White, Derrill Reynolds, David Conger, Ricky Hounchell, Steven Bayliss, Lindsey Bray, Donna Good, Francine Ford, Natasha Lainhart, Michelle Keplinger, Irene Hyde, Brian Atkins, Sherri Puckett-Morrissette, Heather Schuster, Nellie Davis, Gayle Bachmann, Nancy Bowman, Valarie Kopp, Hiram McCauley, Katherine Walls, Marjorie Newman, Dorothea Hamilton, Dana Conley, Linda Favaron, Timothy Schulze, Patrick Willoughby, Joann Frazier, Susan Schock, Ronald Schuster, Elaine Waxler, Deborah Worley, Jonathan Atwell, Christine Geralds, Vicky Mains, Katrina Allen, Michael Sander, Stacy Fletcher, Shirley Mains, Rhonda Mains, Michael Crail, Misty Emerson, Michelle Sizemore, Jacqueline Judkins, David Huser, Paul Boggs, Lennie Fossett, Tara Brown, Deborah Kidd, Karen Johnson, Rebecca Applegate, Arletta Bowling, Ron Wright, Patricia Boone, Nicole Baker, Barbara Hensley, Heather McCann, Tiffany Meadows, Brenda Conley, Timothy Whalen, Ronald Rowley, Jeffrey Poff, Gerald Botner, Sharon Howard, Sharon Brice, JoAnn Young, Jody Bauer, Priscilla Wittmeyer, William Benton, Jeff Remley, Kimberly Jenkins, Dannie Owens, Ralph Dawson, Amber Work, Jason Romer, Delores Scott, Darrell Earls, David Snider, Stephanie Hawks, Nodra West, William Wolder, Diana Ashcraft, Tamala Lovette, Debra Henderson, Jennifer Ballinger, Sandra Radeke, Veronica Yeakle, Amanda Koch, Henry Curry, Martha Kibler, Joan Jones, Carol Wilson, Gloria Greene, Cindy Bartlett, David Hall, Penny Brackett, Kevin Hartness, Charlotte King, Joetta Nafe, Brian Thien, Kelly Engle, Eddie Stallings, Joseph Davis, Robert Densler, Gordon Rister, Terry Wilson, Maurice Grabow, Vera Moffitt, Teresa Nichols, Traci Matthews, Gail Nordeman, Patricia Adams, Michelle Byar, Carolyn Hursong, Robert Runtz, Tom Pritchard, Barbara Couch, Dawn Dunklin, Phyllis Bechtold, Erin Greelish, Randall Metcalf, Evelyn Helton, Tammy Hughes, Tonya Chisman, Stephen Carmen, Heather Pickett, Kyra McClendon, Kelly Robinson, Richard Brorein, Christina Canfield, Gary Neu, Billy Dugger, Rita Hounchell, Celeste Hoffman, Shandon Simmons, Todd Ray and Paul Scholz
Defendant: Benjamin C. Glassman and United States of America, Department Of Health Of Human Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv00598
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Albert Winter, Jr for Plaintiffs Frieda Aaron, Patricia Adams, James Albers, Katrina Allen, Sherri Allen, Rebecca Applegate, Diana Ashcraft, Brian Atkins, Jonathan Atwell, Christopher Atwood, Thomas Augst, Gayle Bachmann, Nicole Baker, Jennifer Ballinger, Ciera Barr, Cindy Bartlett, Kimberly Bates, Laura Batsche, Jody Bauer, Steven Bayliss, Phyllis Bechtold, Judy Beck, Cathy Beil, Terry Beil, William Benton, Leona Beyer, Edythe Bishop, Paul Boggs, Malika Bonner, Patricia Boone, Gerald Botner, Arletta Bowling, Nancy Bowman, Penny Brackett, Latoya Bradshaw, Christina Brashear, Lindsey Bray, Randy Brewer, Sharon Brice, Michael Brophy, Richard Brorein, Calvin Brown, Dawn Lee Ann Brown, Tara Brown, Vicki Buschur, Jack Buskirk, Michelle Byar, Doug Callahan, Christina Canfield, Stephen Carmen, Tonya Chisman, Michael Collins, Elizabeth Compo, David Conger, Brenda Conley, Dana Conley, Lisa Conley, Michael Cook, Gary Coots, Barbara Couch, Sandra Couch, Michael Crail, Joi Crowe, Henry Curry, William Dabney, Joseph Davis, Nellie Davis, Ralph Dawson, Ollie Deaton, Sandra Dennis, Robert Densler, Kristine Dority, Billy Dugger, Dawn Dunklin, Darrell Earls, Misty Emerson, Kelly Engle, Brenda Errgang, Arlene Fait, Linda Favaron, Jean Fenner, David Fisher, Stacy Fletcher, Francine Ford, Lennie Fossett, Joann Frazier, Christine Geralds, Mary Gerbus, Christina Goldstein, Donna Good, Maurice Grabow, Erin Greelish, Gloria Greene, Susan Griffin, Jenny Grimm, David Hall, Dorothea Hamilton, Courtney Hammons, Kevin Hartness, Wayne Hatfield, Stephanie Hawks, Douglas Hayes, Evelyn Helton, Debra Henderson, Kelly Hennessy, Barbara Hensley, Ryan Hensley, Karen Higginbothan, Celeste Hoffman, Cathy Holley, Ricky Hounchell, Rita Hounchell, Sharon Howard, Tammy Hughes, Carolyn Hursong, David Huser, Irene Hyde, Elsa Ieraci, Melvin James, Kimberly Jenkins, Karen Johnson, Roger Johnson, Joan Jones, Jacqueline Judkins, Jacqueline Judkins, Michelle Keplinger, Martha Kibler, Deborah Kidd, Charlotte King, Amanda Koch, Shannon Koehler, Valarie Kopp, Shelia Pogue Krabacher, Larry Krech, Natasha Lainhart, Katie Lehmkuhl, Sandra Lemmel, Tammie Little, Tamala Lovette, Richard Lozier, Rhonda Mains, Shirley Mains, Vicky Mains, Traci Matthews, Heather McCann, Christopher McCaughey, Hiram McCauley, Kyra McClendon, Candi McKinney, Teresa McMillen, Mark McMurren, Kerry McNeal, Tonia McQueary, Tiffany Meadows, Randall Metcalf, Vera Moffitt, Donald Moore, Robert Moore, Joetta Nafe, Gary Neu, Marjorie Newman, Teresa Nichols, Gail Nordeman, Dannie Owens, Nancy Pfetsch, Heather Pickett, Jeffrey Poff, Tom Pritchard, Sherri Puckett-Morrissette, Sandra Radeke, Todd Ray, Danielle Reed, Valerie Reeves, Jeff Remley, Derrill Reynolds, Harry Reynolds, Gordon Rister, Theresa Robbinson-Woods, Kelly Robinson, Debbie Rodriguez, Jason Romer, Dorothy Rose, Ronald Rowley, Robert Runtz, Michael Sander, Chris Scheper, Robin Schiller, Joseph Schimmel, Susan Schock, Paul Scholz, Timothy Schulze, Heather Schuster, Ronald Schuster, Delores Scott, Rhonda Scott, Shandon Simmons, Karen Sisson, Michelle Sizemore, David Smith, David Snider, Eddie Stallings, Richard Stanfield, Patrick Stephenson, Tempie Stephenson, Darlene Sterling, Deborah Sturdivant, Kathleen Teslcher, Brian Thien, Clara Tubbs-Hill, Connie Underwood, Katherine Walls, Michael Watkins, Elaine Waxler, Nodra West, Timothy Whalen, Violet Whalen, Lonnie Wheeler, Sophia White, Joseph Wilder, Kelly Williams, Patrick Willoughby, Carol Wilson, Paul Wilson, Paula Wilson, Robert Wilson, Terry Wilson, Dawn Wingert, Priscilla Wittmeyer, William Wolder, Amber Work, Deborah Worley, Deborah Worley, Ron Wright, Veronica Yeakle, JoAnn Young, Judy Young (Winter, Robert)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant United States of America, Department Of Health Of Human Services. United States of America, Department Of Health Of Human Services served on 8/1/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (jlw)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret A Castro for Defendant United States of America, Department Of Health Of Human Services (Castro, Margaret)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 1:18-cv-599 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Michael R. Barrett for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 07/26/2019. (bjc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (bjc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, (bjc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America, Department Of Health Of Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (bjc)
July 25, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Relief (28 U.S.C. Section 2201-2202 against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7025572), filed by Frieda Aaron, Patricia Adams, James Albers, Katrina Allen, Sherri Allen, Rebecca Applegate, Diana Ashcraft, Brian Atkins, Jonathan Atwell, Christopher Atwood, Thomas Augst, Gayle Bachmann, Nicole Baker, Jennifer Ballinger, Ciera Barr, Cindy Bartlett, Kimberly Bates, Laura Batsche, Jody Bauer, Steven Bayliss, Phyllis Bechtold, Judy Beck, Cathy Beil, Terry Beil, William Benton, Leona Beyer, Edythe Bishop, Paul Boggs, Malika Bonner, Patricia Boone, Gerald Botner, Arletta Bowling, Nancy Bowman, Penny Brackett, Latoya Bradshaw, Christina Brashear, Lindsey Bray, Randy Brewer, Sharon Brice, Michael Brophy, Richard Brorein, Calvin Brown, Dawn Lee Ann Brown, Tara Brown, Vicki Buschur, Jack Buskirk, Michelle Byar, Doug Callahan, Christina Canfield, Stephen Carmen, Tonya Chisman, Michael Collins, Elizabeth Compo, David Conger, Brenda Conley, Dana Conley, Lisa Conley, Michael Cook, Gary Coots, Barbara Couch, Sandra Couch, Michael Crail, Joi Crowe, Henry Curry, William Dabney, Joseph Davis, Nellie Davis, Ralph Dawson, Ollie Deaton, Sandra Dennis, Robert Densler, Kristine Dority, Billy Dugger, Dawn Dunklin, Darrell Earls, Misty Emerson, Kelly Engle, Brenda Errgang, Arlene Fait, Linda Favaron, Jean Fenner, David Fisher, Stacy Fletcher, Francine Ford, Lennie Fossett, Joann Frazier, Christine Geralds, Mary Gerbus, Christina Goldstein, Donna Good, Maurice Grabow, Erin Greelish, Gloria Greene, Susan Griffin, Jenny Grimm, David Hall, Dorothea Hamilton, Courtney Hammons, Kevin Hartness, Wayne Hatfield, Stephanie Hawks, Douglas Hayes, Evelyn Helton, Debra Henderson, Kelly Hennessy, Barbara Hensley, Ryan Hensley, Karen Higginbothan, Celeste Hoffman, Cathy Holley, Ricky Hounchell, Rita Hounchell, Sharon Howard, Tammy Hughes, Carolyn Hursong, David Huser, Irene Hyde, Elsa Ieraci, Melvin James, Kimberly Jenkins, Karen Johnson, Roger Johnson, Joan Jones, Jacqueline Judkins, Michelle Keplinger, Martha Kibler, Deborah Kidd, Charlotte King, Amanda Koch, Shannon Koehler, Valarie Kopp, Shelia Pogue Krabacher, Larry Krech, Natasha Lainhart, Katie Lehmkuhl, Sandra Lemmel, Tammie Little, Tamala Lovette, Richard Lozier, Rhonda Mains, Shirley Mains, Vicky Mains, Traci Matthews, Heather McCann, Christopher McCaughey, Hiram McCauley, Kyra McClendon, Candi McKinney, Teresa McMillen, Mark McMurren, Kerry McNeal, Tonia McQueary, Tiffany Meadows, Randall Metcalf, Vera Moffitt, Donald Moore, Robert Moore, Joetta Nafe, Gary Neu, Marjorie Newman, Teresa Nichols, Gail Nordeman, Dannie Owens, Nancy Pfetsch, Heather Pickett, Jeffrey Poff, Tom Pritchard, Sherri Puckett-Morrissette, Sandra Radeke, Todd Ray, Danielle Reed, Valerie Reeves, Jeff Remley, Derrill Reynolds, Harry Reynolds, Gordon Rister, Theresa Robbinson-Woods, Kelly Robinson, Debbie Rodriguez, Jason Romer, Dorothy Rose, Ronald Rowley, Robert Runtz, Michael Sander, Chris Scheper, Robin Schiller, Joseph Schimmel, Susan Schock, Paul Scholz, Timothy Schulze, Heather Schuster, Ronald Schuster, Delores Scott, Rhonda Scott, Shandon Simmons, Karen Sisson, Michelle Sizemore, David Smith, David Snider, Eddie Stallings, Richard Stanfield, Patrick Stephenson, Tempie Stephenson, Darlene Sterling, Deborah Sturdivant, Kathleen Teslcher, Brian Thien, Clara Tubbs-Hill, Connie Underwood, Katherine Walls, Michael Watkins, Elaine Waxler, Nodra West, Timothy Whalen, Violet Whalen, Lonnie Wheeler, Sophia White, Joseph Wilder, Kelly Williams, Patrick Willoughby, Carol Wilson, Paul Wilson, Paula Wilson, Robert Wilson, Terry Wilson, Dawn Wingert, Priscilla Wittmeyer, William Wolder, Amber Work, Deborah Worley, Ron Wright, Veronica Yeakle, JoAnn Young, Judy Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form) (Maraan, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron et al v. United States of America, Department Of Health Of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Fait
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Tubbs-Hill
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Teslcher
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Atwood
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Schimmel
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Sterling
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Sisson
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Rodriguez
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Lemmel
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Gerbus
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Dority
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dabney
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Underwood
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Williams
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Hensley
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Albers
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Fenner
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Krech
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Young
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry McNeal
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Higginbothan
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonia McQueary
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leona Beyer
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Collins
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ollie Deaton
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Hatfield
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Callahan
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Sturdivant
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Robbinson-Woods
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Watkins
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frieda Aaron
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Hammons
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Brewer
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Rose
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelia Pogue Krabacher
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Smith
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin James
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Holley
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsa Ieraci
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Koehler
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Bates
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malika Bonner
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tempie Stephenson
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Grimm
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Brophy
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Augst
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Couch
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Beck
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Brown
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Conley
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Wilder
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Buskirk
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candi McKinney
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie Little
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Batsche
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa McMillen
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joi Crowe
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Beil
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Coots
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Hayes
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lozier
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Reeves
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edythe Bishop
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Stephenson
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Allen
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Lehmkuhl
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Lee Ann Brown
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Fisher
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Schiller
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ciera Barr
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violet Whalen
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Stanfield
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Reynolds
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Reed
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Wheeler
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Goldstein
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoya Bradshaw
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Moore
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark McMurren
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Moore
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Pfetsch
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Buschur
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Wingert
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Griffin
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Brashear
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Compo
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Errgang
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Scheper
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher McCaughey
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Scott
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cook
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Dennis
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Beil
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Hennessy
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia White
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrill Reynolds
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Conger
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Hounchell
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Bayliss
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Bray
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Good
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francine Ford
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Lainhart
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Keplinger
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Hyde
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Atkins
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Puckett-Morrissette
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Schuster
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nellie Davis
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle Bachmann
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Bowman
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valarie Kopp
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiram McCauley
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Walls
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Newman
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothea Hamilton
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Conley
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Favaron
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Schulze
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Willoughby
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Frazier
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Schock
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Schuster
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Waxler
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Worley
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Atwell
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Geralds
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Mains
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Allen
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sander
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Fletcher
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Mains
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Mains
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Crail
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Emerson
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Sizemore
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Judkins
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Huser
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Boggs
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lennie Fossett
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Brown
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Kidd
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Applegate
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arletta Bowling
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Wright
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Boone
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Baker
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Hensley
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather McCann
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Meadows
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Conley
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Whalen
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Rowley
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Poff
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Botner
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Howard
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Brice
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnn Young
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Bauer
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla Wittmeyer
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Benton
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Remley
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Jenkins
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dannie Owens
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Dawson
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Work
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Romer
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Scott
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Earls
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Snider
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Hawks
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nodra West
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Wolder
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Ashcraft
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamala Lovette
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Henderson
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Ballinger
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Radeke
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Yeakle
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Koch
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Curry
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Kibler
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Jones
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Greene
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Bartlett
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hall
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Brackett
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Hartness
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte King
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joetta Nafe
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Thien
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Engle
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Stallings
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Davis
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Densler
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Rister
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Grabow
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vera Moffitt
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Nichols
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci Matthews
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Nordeman
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Adams
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Byar
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Hursong
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Runtz
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Pritchard
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Couch
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Dunklin
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Bechtold
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Greelish
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Metcalf
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Helton
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Hughes
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Chisman
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Carmen
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Pickett
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyra McClendon
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Robinson
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Brorein
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Canfield
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Neu
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Dugger
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Hounchell
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste Hoffman
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shandon Simmons
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Ray
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Scholz
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin C. Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, Department Of Health Of Human Services
Represented By: Margaret A Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?