Ryder et al v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Plaintiff: Ethan Ryder and Diane Hawkins
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00638
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica E Salisbury-Copper for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Salisbury-Copper, Jessica)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Wells Fargo & Company identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank N.A... (King, Scott)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Allen King for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (King, Scott)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Devon A. Gray. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 8/20/19. (rrs)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Clay M. Gatens. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 8/19/19. (rrs)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7068608) of Devon Gray by Plaintiffs Diane Hawkins, Ethan Ryder. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Gray, #2 Exhibit Gray COGS, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Dann, Marc)
August 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7067511) of Clay Gatens by Plaintiffs Diane Hawkins, Ethan Ryder. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Gatens, #2 Exhibit Gatens COGS, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Dann, Marc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Wells Fargo Bank N.A. on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Flick, Brian)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (bjc)
August 5, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. Judge Michael R. Barrett no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 8/2/19. (ba)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Wells Fargo Bank N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7044455), filed by Ethan Ryder, Diane Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hawkins Glitch, #2 Exhibit B - Ryder Glitch, #3 Exhibit C - Kobi Affidavit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Form) (Dann, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryder et al v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan Ryder
Represented By: Marc E Dann
Represented By: Clay M. Gatens
Represented By: Brian Flick
Represented By: Daniel M. Solar
Represented By: Devon A. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Hawkins
Represented By: Marc E Dann
Represented By: Clay M. Gatens
Represented By: Brian Flick
Represented By: Daniel M. Solar
Represented By: Devon A. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Jessica E Salisbury-Copper
Represented By: Scott Allen King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?