H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. v. Bettencourt et al
Plaintiff: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Christine Bettencourt and Daniel Bettencourt
Case Number: 1:2019cv00673
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Daniel Bettencourt. Daniel Bettencourt served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Gustavson, William)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Christine Bettencourt. Christine Bettencourt served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Gustavson, William)
October 2, 2019 Notice of Correction re: #6 Affidavit of Service, #5 Affidavit of Service, documents were filed using the incorrect event. The filer has been contacted and is to re-file using the correct event. (bjc)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 [FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD] AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint to Christine M. Bettencourt served on Daniel J. Bettencourt on September 12, 2019, filed by Plaintiff H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.. (Gustavson, William) Modified Docket Text on 10/2/2019 (bjc).
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 [FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD] AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Daniel J. Bettencourt on September 12, 2019, filed by Plaintiff H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.. (Gustavson, William) Modified Docket Text on 10/2/2019 (bjc).
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Christine Bettencourt, Daniel Bettencourt. (jlw)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Gustavson, William)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Gustavson, William)
August 19, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7066534), filed by H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H) (Gustavson, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. v. Bettencourt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Bettencourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Bettencourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.
Represented By: William Michael Gustavson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?