Johnson et al v. Trinity Couriers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Johnson, Marcus Johnson, Veronica Renda, Tatiana Mance and Christopher Lymon
Defendant: Trinity Couriers of St. Louis, Inc., Trinity Couriers of DFW, Inc., Trinity Couriers of Houston, Inc., Rush of Ohio, Inc., Trinity Couriers of Austin, Inc., Trinity Couriers, Inc., Trinity Couriers of Minnesota, Inc., Trinity Couriers of Ohio, Inc., Trinity Couriers of Kansas, Inc., Trinity Couriers of Denver, Inc. and Trinity Couriers of San Antonio, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00686
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion to Stay Case Deadlines, Including Answer Deadlines for Purposes of Mediation. The Court hereby STAYS this action until 11/18/2019 to allow the parties to explore possible resolution of this matter by way of an alternative dispute resolution process. This stay shall further allow Defendants to seek a nunc pro tunc extension of any answer deadline which may have previously elapsed, should mediation not be successful. The parties are hereby ORDERED, no later than 11/18/2019, to prepare and jointly file a report advising the Court of the status of settlement discussions and outcome of the mediation. Additionally, if a settlement in principle has been reached, the parties shall provide a schedule for the presentation of the settlement to the Court for its approval. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 10/3/2019. (km)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines, Including Answer Dates for Purposes of Mediation by Plaintiffs Christopher Johnson, Marcus Johnson, Christopher Lymon, Tatiana Mance, Veronica Renda. (Legando, Drew)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 #5 #6 #7 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Krysten L. Connon, Michaela Wallin, Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen, and Ryan Allen Hancock. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 9/19/19. (wam)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Rush of Ohio, Inc., Trinity Couriers of Austin, Inc., Trinity Couriers of DFW, Inc., Trinity Couriers of Denver, Inc., Trinity Couriers of Houston, Inc., Trinity Couriers of Kansas, Inc., Trinity Couriers of Minnesota, Inc., Trinity Couriers of Ohio, Inc., Trinity Couriers of San Antonio, Inc., Trinity Couriers of St. Louis, Inc., Trinity Couriers, Inc.. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form, #7 Summons Form, #8 Summons Form, #9 Summons Form, #10 Summons Form) (Legando, Drew)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7106449) of Ryan Allen Hancock by Plaintiffs Christopher Johnson, Marcus Johnson, Christopher Lymon, Tatiana Mance, Veronica Renda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Legando, Drew)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7098566) of Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen by Plaintiffs Christopher Johnson, Marcus Johnson, Christopher Lymon, Tatiana Mance, Veronica Renda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Legando, Drew)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7098554) of Michaela Wallin by Plaintiffs Christopher Johnson, Marcus Johnson, Christopher Lymon, Tatiana Mance, Veronica Renda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Legando, Drew)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7098474) of Krysten L. Connon by Plaintiffs Christopher Johnson, Marcus Johnson, Christopher Lymon, Tatiana Mance, Veronica Renda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Legando, Drew)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Rush of Ohio, Inc., Trinity Couriers of Austin, Inc., Trinity Couriers of DFW, Inc., Trinity Couriers of Denver, Inc., Trinity Couriers of Houston, Inc., Trinity Couriers of Kansas, Inc., Trinity Couriers of Minnesota, Inc., Trinity Couriers of Ohio, Inc., Trinity Couriers of San Antonio, Inc., Trinity Couriers of St. Louis, Inc., Trinity Couriers, Inc. (eh)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (vp)
August 21, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7071005), filed by Christopher Lymon, Tatiana Mance, Christopher Johnson, Marcus Johnson, Veronica Renda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join - Christopher Johnson, #2 Exhibit Consent to Join - Tatiana Mance, #3 Exhibit Consent to Join - Christopher Lymon, #4 Exhibit Consent to Join - Marcus Johnson, #5 Exhibit Consent to Join - Veronica Renda, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Form Trinity Couriers, Inc., #8 Summons Form Trinity Couriers of Ohio, Inc., #9 Summons Form Trinity Couriers of Houston, Inc., #10 Summons Form Trinity Couriers of Kansas, Inc., #11 Summons Form Trinity Couriers of St. Louis, Inc., #12 Summons Form Trinity Couriers of San Antonio, Inc., #13 Summons Form Trinity Couriers of Austin, Inc., #14 Summons Form Trinity Couriers of DFW, Inc., #15 Summons Form Trinity Couriers of Minnesota, Inc., #16 Summons Form Trinity Couriers of Denver, Inc., #17 Summons Form Rush of Ohio, Inc.) (Legando, Drew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2019: #18 Complaint Signature Page) (eh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Trinity Couriers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Johnson
Represented By: Drew T. Legando
Represented By: Krysten L. Connon
Represented By: Ryan Allen Hancock
Represented By: Michaela L. Wallin
Represented By: Sarah R Schalman-Bergen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Johnson
Represented By: Drew T. Legando
Represented By: Krysten L. Connon
Represented By: Ryan Allen Hancock
Represented By: Michaela L. Wallin
Represented By: Sarah R Schalman-Bergen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Renda
Represented By: Drew T. Legando
Represented By: Krysten L. Connon
Represented By: Ryan Allen Hancock
Represented By: Michaela L. Wallin
Represented By: Sarah R Schalman-Bergen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatiana Mance
Represented By: Drew T. Legando
Represented By: Krysten L. Connon
Represented By: Ryan Allen Hancock
Represented By: Michaela L. Wallin
Represented By: Sarah R Schalman-Bergen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lymon
Represented By: Drew T. Legando
Represented By: Krysten L. Connon
Represented By: Ryan Allen Hancock
Represented By: Michaela L. Wallin
Represented By: Sarah R Schalman-Bergen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Couriers of St. Louis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Couriers of DFW, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Couriers of Houston, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rush of Ohio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Couriers of Austin, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Couriers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Couriers of Minnesota, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Couriers of Ohio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Couriers of Kansas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Couriers of Denver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Couriers of San Antonio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?