Steele v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: John K. Steele
Defendant: Rebecca Pomatto, Gregory F. Van Tatenhove, Attorney General William P. Barr, United States of America and Benjamin F. Ray
Case Number: 1:2019cv00705
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Responses due by 11/18/2019) by Defendants United States of America, Gregory F. Van Tatenhove. (Konig, Jordan)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 State Court Record . (Konig, Jordan)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendant United States of America. (Konig, Jordan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff John K. Steele. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Envelope) (eh)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Attorney General William P. Barr, Rebecca Pomatto, Benjamin F. Ray, United States of America, Gregory F. Van Tatenhove, filed by John K. Steele in the Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas case A1903510. (bjc)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting USA's #2 Motion for Extension of Time up to and including 10/25/2019 in which to answer, move, or otherwise plead in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/28/2019. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 10/25/2019. by Defendant United States of America. (Horwitz, Matthew)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A 1903510, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint) (Horwitz, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steele v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John K. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Pomatto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory F. Van Tatenhove
Represented By: Jordan A. Konig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Horwitz
Represented By: Jordan A. Konig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin F. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?