Luxottica Group S.P.A. v. Lutes et al
Plaintiff: Luxottica Group S.p.A.
Defendant: Sheena L. Armstrong and Cynthia M. Lutes
Case Number: 1:2019cv00765
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 10/28/19. (rrs)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 11/25/2019. by Defendants Cynthia M. Lutes, Sheena Lutes. (Hill, Steven)
October 7, 2019 Reset Deadlines re doc. #9 : Cynthia M. Lutes answer due 10/28/2019; Sheena Lutes answer due 10/28/2019. (eh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND by Defendants Cynthia M. Lutes, Sheena Lutes. (Hill, Steven)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Allen Hill for Defendants Cynthia M. Lutes, Sheena Lutes (Hill, Steven)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Sheena Lutes. Sheena Lutes served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Bennett, John)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Cynthia M. Lutes. Cynthia M. Lutes served on 9/15/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Bennett, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cynthia M. Lutes, Sheena Lutes. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (jlw)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Bennett, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Luxottica Group S.p.A.. (Bennett, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Sheena L.Lutes, Cynthia M. Lutes ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7102879), filed by Luxottica Group S.p.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ray-Ban Registrations, #2 Exhibit 2 - Wayfarer Registration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Clubmaster Registration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Outdoorsman Registration, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Form, #7 Summons Form) (Bennett, John) Modified on 9/16/2019 (jlw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luxottica Group S.P.A. v. Lutes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luxottica Group S.p.A.
Represented By: John Francis Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheena L. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia M. Lutes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?