State Farm Fire & Casaulty Company et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: State Farm Automobile Insurance Company and State Farm Fire & Casaulty Company
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00783
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL by Plaintiff State Farm Fire & Casaulty Company. (Sabatino, Alessandro)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CALENDAR ORDER: Motions to Amend due by 11/4/2019. Motions directed to pleadings due by 11/4/2019. Status Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 02:00 PM by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 6/1/2020. Defendant Primary Expert due by 7/31/2020. Disclosure of Non-Expert (Fact) Witness due by 4/1/2020. Discovery (Expert) due by 9/28/2020. Discovery (Fact) due by 6/1/2020. Dispositive motions due by 11/20/2020. Responses due by 12/11/2020 Replies due by 12/25/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2021 at 01:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Bench trial 6/2021. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 10/28/19. (ba)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 Joint RULE 26(f) REPORT Joint Discovery Plan by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (McLaughlin, Conor) Modified docket text on 10/15/2019 (eh).
September 23, 2019 NOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/15/2019. Please be aware that the Court has revised its Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures; visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of those required forms; (ba)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint filed by Ford Motor Company. (McLaughlin, Conor)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (McLaughlin, Conor)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by State Farm Fire & Casaulty Company, State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. Filed in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas on 8/13/2019 as case number A1903770 (jlw)
September 16, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Addendum to Corporate Disclosure Statement) (McLaughlin, Conor)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A1903770 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7107223), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Executed Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C - State Farm Illinois Dept. of Insurance filings, #4 Exhibit D - State Farm Illinois Dept. of Insurance filings, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (McLaughlin, Conor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire & Casaulty Company et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Alessandro Sabatino, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casaulty Company
Represented By: Alessandro Sabatino, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Conor A McLaughlin
Represented By: Jefferson C.M. Kisor
Represented By: Elizabeth B Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?