Winstead-Walters v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Theresa D. Winstead-Walters
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00797
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 10/28/19. (ba)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Ochoa, Susana)
October 10, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 12/3/2019. (eh)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Rake, Michael) Modified to correct answer deadline on 10/10/2019 (eh).
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Susana Ochoa for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Ochoa, Susana)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and sent to the marshal for service. (jlw) Modified on 9/23/2019 (jlw).
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Theresa D. Winstead-Walters. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jlw)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and ORDERING the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint,summons, and this Order granting leave to proceed in forma pauperis upon defendant as directedby plaintiff.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/23/2019. (jlw)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Theresa D. Winstead-Walters. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form) (Rake, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winstead-Walters v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa D. Winstead-Walters
Represented By: Michael A Rake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Susana Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?