Smith v. Central Research, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Edward Smith
Defendant: Financial Asset Management Systems, Inc., Radius Global Solutions, LLC, Central Research, Inc. and Navient Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00798
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing fee: $ 200.00, receipt number 100CIN038034 for #23 PHV filing fee for Brian D. Roth (jlw)
November 13, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Brian D. Roth by Defendants Financial Asset Management Systems, Inc., Navient Solutions, LLC, Radius Global Solutions, LLC. (Mahon, Michael)
November 12, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Central Research, Inc.. (Brunton, Gregory)
November 6, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Navient Solutions, LLC. (Mahon, Michael)
November 6, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Radius Global Solutions, LLC. (Mahon, Michael)
November 5, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Financial Asset Management Systems, Inc.. (Mahon, Michael)
November 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Michael M. Mahon substituting for Jeffrey C. Turner and David B. Shaver as to Defendant Financial Asset Management Systems, Inc.. (Mahon, Michael)
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Defendant Navient Solutions, LLC Notice of Unopposed Withdrawal As Counsel By Bryan T. Kostura and McGlinchey Stafford (Kostura, Bryan)
October 18, 2019 Reset Deadlines per doc. #14 : Radius Global Solutions, LLC answer due 11/7/2019. (Please Note: Doc. #4 Waiver Returned Executed for Defendant Navient Solutions set Navient's answer deadline for 11/25/2019). (eh)
October 17, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Radius Global Solutions, LLC. (Mahon, Michael)
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Navient Solutions, LLC. (Mahon, Michael)
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Defendants Navient Solutions, LLC, Radius Global Solutions, LLC. (Mahon, Michael)
October 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Central Research, Inc. answer due 11/12/2019. (jlw)
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Central Research, Inc.. (Brunton, Gregory)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Move or Plead by Defendant Central Research, Inc.. (Brunton, Gregory)
October 10, 2019 Reset Deadlines per doc. #11 : Financial Asset Management Systems, Inc. answer due 11/6/2019. (eh)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION For Extension of Time by Defendant Financial Asset Management Systems, Inc.. (Turner, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Financial Asset Management Systems, Inc.. (Turner, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David B Shaver for Defendant Financial Asset Management Systems, Inc. (Shaver, David)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Charles Turner for Defendant Financial Asset Management Systems, Inc. (Turner, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Central Research, Inc.. Central Research, Inc. served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (Flick, Brian)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Radius Global Solutions, LLC. Radius Global Solutions, LLC served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. (Flick, Brian)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Financial Asset Management Systems, Inc.. Financial Asset Management Systems, Inc. served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. (Flick, Brian)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Navient Solutions, LLC on 9/26/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Kostura, Bryan)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 9/24/2019. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. (eh)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Central Research, Inc., Financial Asset Management Systems, Inc., Navient Solutions, LLC, Radius Global Solutions, LLC. (jlw)
September 20, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Central Research, Inc., Financial Asset Management Systems, Inc., Navient Solutions, LLC, Radius Global Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7115846), filed by Edward Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-FAMS Dunning Letter, #2 Exhibit 2-Radius Global Collection Letter, #3 Exhibit 3-Navient Letter, #4 Exhibit 4-Central Research Dunning Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Form Central Research, Inc., #7 Summons Form Financial Asset Management Systems, Inc., #8 Summons Form Navient Solutions, LLC, #9 Summons Form Radius Global Solutions, LLC) (Flick, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Central Research, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Asset Management Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Michael M. Mahon
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Turner
Represented By: David B Shaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radius Global Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Michael M. Mahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Research, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Michael M. Mahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Smith
Represented By: Marc E Dann
Represented By: Brian Flick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?