Pierson v. Neil et al
Plaintiff: Clifton Pierson
Defendant: Social Worker Mrs. Price, Sheriff James Neil and Lt. Reed
Case Number: 1:2019cv00843
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Clifton Pierson. (eh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2019: #1 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis/Calculation of Initital Partial Filing Fee) (eh).
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations (Document scanned as received and filed as requested) by Plaintiff Clifton Pierson. (bjc)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED THAT: 1. The plaintiff's complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A(b)(l). 2. The Court certify pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that for the foregoing reasons an appeal of any Order adopting this Report and Recommendation would not be taken in good faith and therefore deny plaintiff leave to appeal in.forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 11/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 11/06/2019. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against James Neil, Price, Reed, filed by Clifton Pierson. (bjc)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 11/06/2019. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Plaintiff Clifton Pierson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Supplemental Documents, #4 Summons Form) (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierson v. Neil et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Worker Mrs. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff James Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?