Horejs et al v. Kitchin et al
Plaintiff: Patrick O'Neill, MICHAEL HOREJS and Lauren Horejs
Defendant: Jason P. Conte, David Kitchin and Nancy Kitchin
Case Number: 1:2019cv00855
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CALENDAR ORDER: Deadline to move to amend pleadings and/or add parties set for 1/6/2020. Discovery deadline set for 7/31/2020. Deadline for Plaintiff to identify experts and provide reports set for 12/2/2019. Deadline for Defendant to identify experts and provide reports set for 2/21/2020. Dispositive motion deadline set for 9/30/2020. The Final Pretrial Conference and trial dates will be scheduled by Judge Dlott. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 11/25/2019. (km)
November 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 11/25/2019. Attorney Bradford Weber appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs (for attorney Patrick O'Neill). Attorney Jason Conte appeared on behalf of Defendants. Calendar Order to follow. (km)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT Joint Discovery Plan by Plaintiffs Lauren Horejs, Michael Horejs. (O'Neill, Patrick)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERNECE NOTICE: Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 11/14/2019. The Court will thereafter, pursuant to Rule 16(b), enter a Calendar Order or will set and hold a Scheduling Conference after which a Calendar Order will be issued. (km)
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Conte, Jason)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (vp)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against David Kitchin, Nancy Kitchin, Patrick O'Neill, filed by Michael Horejs, Lauren Horejs. Filed in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas as case number A1904199. (jlw)
October 9, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A1904199 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7145607), filed by David Kitchin, Nancy Kitchin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supp Civil Cover Sheet) (Conte, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horejs et al v. Kitchin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason P. Conte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kitchin
Represented By: Jason P Conte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Kitchin
Represented By: Jason P Conte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL HOREJS
Represented By: Patrick M O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Horejs
Represented By: Patrick M O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?