Shafor v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Charles N. Shafor
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00860
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Rake, Michael)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kiywhanna LaChic Kellup for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Kellup, Kiywhanna)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Sent to US Marshall for Service with USM-285 Form and Copies of Complaint and Order for Service. (cb)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Charles N. Shafor. (cb)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 10/21/2019. (cb)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Charles N. Shafor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form) (Rake, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shafor v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kiywhanna LaChic Kellup
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles N. Shafor
Represented By: Michael A Rake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?