Dodds v. Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Traci Dodds
Defendant: Ohio Department of Medicaid and Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00908
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to #5 Complaint filed by Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.. (Salzman, Laura)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CALENDAR ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 12/4/2019. Motions directed to pleadings due by 12/20/2019. Motions to Amend due by 1/6/2020. Lay Witness due by 1/20/2020. Status Conference set for 4/20/2020 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Judge Timothy S. Black. Discovery due by 5/29/2020. Dispositive motions due by 6/30/2020. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 12/3/19. (rrs)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry and Notation Order: This civil action came before the Court for a preliminary pretrial conference by telephone on 12/2/19 at 10:30 a.m. Dennis Mahoney appeared on behalf of Plaintiff; Chris Cotter and Laura Salzman appeared on behalf of Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.; and Joseph McCandlish appeared on behalf of Defendant Ohio Department of Medicaid. The parties informed the Court that they will promptly file a stipulation regarding Defendant Ohio Department of Medicaid's realignment. For good cause, the Court GRANTS Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc. leave to file an amended answer on or before 12/16/19. A Calendar Order will issue by separate entry. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 12/2/2019. (rrs)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.. (Cotter, Christopher)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc. Discovery to Plaintiff Traci Dodds (Cotter, Christopher)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Notation Order and Notice of Hearing: A Preliminary Pretrial Conference by telephone is set before Judge Timothy S. Black for 12/2/2019 at 10:30 a.m. COUNSEL SHALL CALL: 1-888-684-8852; Access Code: 8411435; Security Code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. Before the pretrial conference, counsel shall comply with the MANDATORY pre-preliminary pretrial conference between counsel, as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). THE REPORT MUST BE FILED 7 DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial procedures and forms can be found on our website at: https://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPBlack. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/1/19. (rrs)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Defendant State of Ohio, Department of Medicaid filed by Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.. (Cotter, Christopher)
October 28, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc., originally filed 10/22/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1904673) by Ohio Department of Medicaid. (eh)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 10/3/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1904673) by Traci Dodds against Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc., Ohio Department of Medicaid. (eh)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, of Filing Notice of Removal (Cotter, Christopher)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.. (Cotter, Christopher)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.. (Cotter, Christopher)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Common Pleas, case number A 1904673, filed by Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, state court pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Cotter, Christopher)
October 25, 2019 Filing fee (Removal): $ 400.00, receipt number 0648-7172005 (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodds v. Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci Dodds
Represented By: Dennis C Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Department of Medicaid
Represented By: Joseph Michael McCandlish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Edward Cotter
Represented By: Laura E. Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?