Cheers v. Rosa et al
Plaintiff: Lillian Cheers
Defendant: James L. Rosa, A&K Trucking,LLC, J&K Trucking, LLC, John Doe and ABC Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00913
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Plaintiff Lillian Cheers of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Hall, Michael)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Defendants A&K Trucking,LLC, J&K Trucking, LLC, James L. Rosa of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Schmiege, Quinn)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Lillian Cheers. (Hall, Michael)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Quinn M. Schmiege for Defendants A&K Trucking,LLC, J&K Trucking, LLC, James L. Rosa (Schmiege, Quinn)
October 31, 2019 NOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/21/2019. Please be aware that the Court has revised its Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures; visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of those required forms; (ba)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by A&K Trucking,LLC, J&K Trucking, LLC, James L. Rosa. (Pappalardo, Joseph)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against A&K Trucking,LLC, ABC Company, John Doe, J&K Trucking, LLC, James L. Rosa, filed by Lillian Cheers on 10/15/2019 in the Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas case A1904898. (bjc) Modified on 10/29/2019 (eh).
October 29, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant J&K Trucking, LLC. (Pappalardo, Joseph)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A1904898 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7173976), filed by J&K Trucking, LLC, A&K Trucking,LLC, James L. Rosa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Pappalardo, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheers v. Rosa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Rosa
Represented By: Joseph W Pappalardo
Represented By: Quinn M. Schmiege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&K Trucking,LLC
Represented By: Joseph W Pappalardo
Represented By: Quinn M. Schmiege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&K Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Joseph W Pappalardo
Represented By: Quinn M. Schmiege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Cheers
Represented By: Michael Stephen Hall
Represented By: Raymond William Lembke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?