Dabney v. Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Petitioner: James Dabney
Respondent: Warden, Chilicothe Correctional Institution and Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Case Number: 1:2019cv00956
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Douglas R Cole
2 Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by Petitioner James Dabney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (sct)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Because the petitioner has paid the filing fee, the undersigned hereby VACATES the December 18, 2019 #4 Report and Recommendation. It is ORDERED that respondent shall file an answer conforming to the requirements of Rule 5 of the Rules Governing 2254 Cases within sixty (60) days of the date of filing of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/20/2019. (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified Docket Text on 12/23/2019 (bjc).
December 19, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 200COL059982 (jlk)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that petitioner's #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus should be Dismissed for lack of prosecution. Objections to R&R due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/17/2019. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Douglas R. Cole for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 12/11/2019. (ss)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 11/12/2019. Petitioner is ORDERED to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification. Blank IFP form included in mailing to petitioner.)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by James Dabney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(No IFP, or Filing Fee included) (pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dabney v. Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Chilicothe Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Dabney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?