H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. v. Spina et al
Plaintiff: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Niagara Home Services, LLC, Ralph Spina and Kim Spina
Case Number: 1:2019cv00960
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Kim Spina served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019 filed by Plaintiff H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. (Gustavson, William) Modified docket text on 12/17/2019 (eh).
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Ralph Spina served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019 filed by Plaintiff H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.. (Gustavson, William) Modified docket text on 12/17/2019 (eh).
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Niagara Home Services, LLC, Kim Spina, Ralph Spina by Plaintiff H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. (cb)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. To Niagara Home Services, LLC (Gustavson, William)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. To Ralph Spina (Gustavson, William)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. To Kim Spina (Gustavson, William)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 11/13/19. (ba)
November 13, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7194814), filed by H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gustavson, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. v. Spina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niagara Home Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Spina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Spina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.
Represented By: William Michael Gustavson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?