Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois v. Rolfes et al
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois
Defendant: TSS Acquistion Company d/b/a MiQ Partners, Benjamin M. Rolfes and TSS Acquisition Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00976
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Referring Judge: Douglas R Cole
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Regina A. Ripley. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 12/20/2019. (eh)
December 16, 2019 Filing fee: $ 200.00, receipt number 100CIN038302 RE #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Regina Alexandra Ripley. (eh)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Douglas R. Cole for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 12/11/2019. (ss)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to TSS Acquisition Company on 11/20/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Marshall, Robert)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Benjamin M. Rolfes on 11/20/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Marshall, Robert)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Regina Alexandra Ripley by Plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Marshall, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2019: #2 Filing Fee Receipt) (eh). Modified docket text on 12/16/2019 (eh).
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Benjamin M. Rolfes, TSS Acquisition Company. (jlw)
November 18, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois. (Marshall, Robert)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois, SAFECO Insurance Company of America, Safeco Corporation, Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent SAFECO Insurance Company of America, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc. for Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois.. (Marshall, Robert)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7203496), filed by Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Form Rolfes, #6 Summons Form TSS) (Marshall, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois v. Rolfes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TSS Acquistion Company d/b/a MiQ Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin M. Rolfes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TSS Acquisition Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois
Represented By: Robert S Marshall
Represented By: Regina A. Ripley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?