Cornell v. Poehlner
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Cornell
Defendant: Officer Poehlner
Case Number: 1:2019cv00982
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Referring Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 ***Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 1:19-cv-21398, filed 12/16/2019. (er)
December 13, 2019 Case transferred to District of New Jersey.Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (bjc)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF TRANSFER - The Clerk of Courts is hereby DIRECTED TO TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 12/13/2019. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Poehlner, filed by Christopher Lee Cornell. (jlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornell v. Poehlner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Poehlner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?