Quick Feat International Limited v. The J. Peterman Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Quick Feat International Limited
Defendant: JP Outfitters, LLC and The J. Peterman Company LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00991
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Matthew W. McFarland for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 1/3/2020. (ss)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 26(f) REPORT Joint Discovery Plan by Plaintiff Quick Feat International Limited. (Hornbach, Anthony)
December 9, 2019 NOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/30/2019. Please be aware that the Court has revised its Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures; visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of those required forms; (ba)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant JP Outfitters, LLC. (Boydston, Richard)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant JP Outfitters, LLC ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by JP Outfitters, LLC. (Boydston, Richard)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by All Defendants. (Boydston, Richard)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants J. Peterman Company LLC. JP Outfitters, LLC served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; The J. Peterman Company LLC served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (cb)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Mailing: A summons and complaint have been sent via certified mail by the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio on November 21, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (jlw) Modified Date Sent Out on 11/21/2019 (bjc). (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/27/2019) (jlw).
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JP Outfitters, LLC. (bjc)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The J. Peterman Company LLC. (jlw)
November 20, 2019 If this case is referred, it would be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Quick Feat International Limited. (Hornbach, Anthony)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JP Outfitters, LLC, The J. Peterman Company LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7209886), filed by Quick Feat International Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invoice, #2 Summons Form to The J. Peterman Company LLC, #3 Summons Form to JP Outfitters, LLC, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hornbach, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quick Feat International Limited v. The J. Peterman Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Outfitters, LLC
Represented By: Richard Mason Boydston, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The J. Peterman Company LLC
Represented By: Richard Mason Boydston, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quick Feat International Limited
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Hornbach
Represented By: Emily Montion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?