Lamb v. Commissioner for Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kendra Lamb
Defendant: Commissioner for Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01091
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Karl Osterhout as CO-COUNSEL is this matter ONLY. In the event Pro Hac Vice counsel has not yet received a login and password from the Clerk of Courts, they should promptly comply with the Courts Electronic Filing Policies and Procedures Manual which can be found at the Courts website, www.ohsd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 1/28/2020. (ss)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner for Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and sent to the U.S. Marshals for service along with copies of the complaint, copies of the order issuing service, and USM-285 Forms. (bjc)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Commissioner for Social Security Administration, filed by Kendra Lamb. (bjc)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/27/2019. (bjc)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7256238) of Karl E. Osterhout by Plaintiff Kendra Lamb. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Farrell, Clifford)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kendra Lamb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form Attorney General, #4 Summons Form Regional Counsel, #5 Summons Form US Attorney, #6 Exhibit USM form Attorney General, #7 Exhibit USM form Regional Counsel, #8 Exhibit USM form US Attorney) (Farrell, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamb v. Commissioner for Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Lamb
Represented By: Clifford Michael Farrell
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner for Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?