Ladson et al v. Veer Transport, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Leticia F Benty and Imani M Ladson
Defendant: Marshall D. McClendon, Jr., Veer Transport, Inc. and Ohio Department of Job & Family Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv01092
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CALENDAR ORDER: Plaintiffs' deadline for disclosure and report of experts set for 5/15/2020. Defendants' deadline for disclosure and report of experts set for 7/15/2020. Deadline for Disclosure of non-expert (fact) witnesses set for 8/1/2020 (for Plaintiff); 9/1/2020 (for Defendants). Discovery deadline set for 10/15/2020. Telephone Status Conference: October 16, 2020 at 11:00 AM. Counsel shall call 1-888-363-4749; access code: 8651321; security code: 2010. Dispositive motion deadline set for 11/2/2020. Deadline for submission of Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Order set for 1/5/2021. Final Pretrial conference set for 1/8/2021 at 2:00 PM. Jury trial set for 1/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 2/18/2020. (km)
February 18, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman: Telephone Consent Scheduling Conference held on 2/18/2020. Attorney Kenneth Ignozzi appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Attorney Jeffrey Jurca appeared on behalf of Defendants Veer Transport and Marshall McClendon. Attorney Robert Byrne appeared on behalf of Defendant Ohio Dept. of Job & Family Services (for attorney Joseph McCandlish). Calendar Order to follow. (km)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 1/31/2020. (jlw)
January 30, 2020 Filing 12 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Marshall D. McClendon, Jr., Veer Transport, Inc.. (Jurca, Jeffrey)
January 28, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Marshall D. McClendon, Jr., Veer Transport, Inc.. (Jurca, Jeffrey)
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER with Jury Demand to #4 Amended Complaint filed by Marshall D. McClendon, Jr., Veer Transport, Inc.. (Jurca, Jeffrey) Modified docket text on 1/22/2020 (eh).
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE: Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 2/14/2020. The Court will thereafter, pursuant to Rule 16(b), enter a Calendar Order or will set and hold a Scheduling Conference after which a Calendar Order will be issued. (km)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Defendants Marshall D. McClendon, Jr., Veer Transport, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Proof of Rendering Notice of Removal to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Filing of Removal) (Jurca, Jeffrey)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Ohio Department of Job & Family Services filed by Ohio Department of Job & Family Services. (McCandlish, Joseph)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (vp)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Marshall D. McClendon, Jr., Veer Transport, Inc. Filed on 12/23/2019 (jlw)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT AMENDED COMPLAINT against Marshall D. McClendon, Jr., Ohio Department of Job & Family Services, Veer Transport, Inc., filed by Imani M Ladson, Leticia F Benty. Filed in Warren County on 12/12/2019 (jlw)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Marshall D. McClendon, Jr., Veer Transport, Inc., filed by Imani M Ladson, Leticia F Benty. Filed in Warren County Court of Common Pleas on 11/19/2019 as case number 19cv92843. (jlw)
December 27, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Marshall D. McClendon, Jr., Veer Transport, Inc.. (Jurca, Jeffrey)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Warren County, Ohio, case number 2019 CV 92843 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7256388), filed by Marshall D. McClendon, Jr., Veer Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Exhibit Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Jurca, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ladson et al v. Veer Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall D. McClendon, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey John Jurca
Represented By: Cory Clinton Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veer Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey John Jurca
Represented By: Cory Clinton Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Department of Job & Family Services
Represented By: Joseph Michael McCandlish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia F Benty
Represented By: Kenneth J. Ignozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imani M Ladson
Represented By: Kenneth J. Ignozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?