Lott et al v. Goode et al
Plaintiff: Kiara Lott, Housing Opportunities Made Equal (H.O.M.E.) and Shaneisha Heath
Defendant: Rehab in Process LLC and Mr. Lenard Goode
Case Number: 1:2020cv00004
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Lenard Goode on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020; Rehab in Process LLC on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Fitzsimmons, Matthew)
January 3, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 100CIN038436. (sct)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Shaneisha Heath, Housing Opportunities Made Equal (H.O.M.E.), Kiara Lott re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Fitzsimmons, Matthew)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (vp)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 3, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND under Fair Housing Act against All Defendants filed by Kiara Lott, Housing Opportunities Made Equal (H.O.M.E.), Shaneisha Heath. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fitzsimmons, Matthew) Modified docket text on 1/2/2020 (cb). Modified docket text on 1/6/2020 (eh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lott et al v. Goode et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rehab in Process LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Lenard Goode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiara Lott
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Fitzsimmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Housing Opportunities Made Equal (H.O.M.E.)
Represented By: Michael T Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaneisha Heath
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Fitzsimmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?