Robeson v. Swift Transportation Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jasmine Robeson
Defendant: Swift Transportation Services, LLC, Hudson Insurance Agency, LLC c/o Norman Hudson, Statutory Agent, Joel Jason Phillips, NC Medicaid Division of Health Benefits and Hudson Insurance Agency, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00028
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Joel Jason Phillips, Swift Transportation Services, LLC. (Salzman, Laura)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Joel Jason Phillips, Swift Transportation Services, LLC. (Salzman, Laura)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE: Rule 26(f) Joint Discovery Plan due by 3/11/2020. The Court will thereafter, pursuant to Rule 16(b), enter a Calendar Order or will set and hold a Scheduling Conference after which a Calendar Order will be issued. (km)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 1/13/2020. (jlw)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Hudson Insurance Agency, LLC. Filed in the Warren County Court of Common Pleas Case 19CV92869. (bjc) Modified docket text on 1/13/2020 (sct).
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Joel Jason Phillips, Swift Transportation Services, LLC in the Warren County Court of Common Pleas Case 19CV92869. (bjc)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Hudson Insurance Agency, LLC, NC Medicaid Division of Health Benefits, Joel Jason Phillips, Swift Transportation Services, LLC, filed by Jasmine Robeson Filed in the Warren County Court of Common Pleas Case 19CV92869. (bjc)
January 10, 2020 If this case is referred,it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Warren County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19CV92869 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7273711), filed by Joel Jason Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Proceedings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Salzman, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robeson v. Swift Transportation Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Services, LLC
Represented By: Bradley Abbott Wright
Represented By: Christopher Edward Cotter
Represented By: Laura E. Salzman,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Insurance Agency, LLC c/o Norman Hudson, Statutory Agent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Jason Phillips
Represented By: Laura E. Salzman
Represented By: Bradley Abbott Wright
Represented By: Christopher Edward Cotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NC Medicaid Division of Health Benefits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Insurance Agency, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Robeson
Represented By: Gayle P Vojtush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?