H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. v. Spearson et al
Plaintiff: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.
Defendant: William Spearson, Tammy Spearson and Sencare, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00049
Filed: January 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Sencare, LLC. Sencare, LLC served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Gustavson, William)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant William Spearson. William Spearson served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Gustavson, William)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Tammy Spearson. Tammy Spearson served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Gustavson, William)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sencare, LLC, Tammy Spearson, William Spearson. (bjc)
January 28, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. for all Defendants (Gustavson, William)
January 21, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw)
January 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7288293), filed by H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gustavson, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. v. Spearson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Spearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Spearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sencare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.
Represented By: William Michael Gustavson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?