Jrafto Antio Parker David Alexander Muina v. The St. Joe Real Estate Co. 133 South Water Sound Water Sound Florida 32413 et al
Plaintiff: Jrafto Antio Parker David Alexander Muina
Defendant: The St. Joe Real Estate Co. 133 South Water Sound Water Sound Florida 32413, Thomas Hoyer, Asssitant D.A., Williams Staffords, HGG GGF Coconspiring Defendant G Woodall, William Stafford, Jim Neils C Incimnmnati Ohio Police, Marii Reed, Dennis Schnurr, Denis Schnurr, KKKSS, LaSalle Roman Csatholic KKKNazis Abusewrs, HOIISS, KKKFloidss MichaelMichael Listerss, High School, GSS Rommell Coconspiring Defendants, GKKKS CoconSpiring Defendants, Jim Neils Tudulizter, Michelle Michael Kuebler, Sheriff Departrments GGD GGSD Cocospiring Defendants, Bill Clinton of 77 Water Sound New York and Bill Clitnon of 77 Water Sound New York
Case Number: 1:2020cv00122
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT filed concurrently with #7 Order signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/9/20. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Vacate; finding as moot #4 Report and Recommendations and finding as moot #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/9/20. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Vacate #3 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Jrafto Antio Parker David Alexander Muina. (bjc)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Plaintiff Jrafto Antio Parker David Alexander Muina. (bjc) Modified File Date on 3/5/2020 (bjc).
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED THAT: 1. Plaintiff's complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice. 2. The Court certify pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 191 S(a) that for the foregoing reasons an appeal of any Order adopting this Report and Recommendation would not be taken in good faith and therefore deny plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauper is. Objections to R&R due by 3/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 02/19/2020. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Asssitant D.A., Bill Clinton of 77 Water Sound New York, Denis Schnurr, Dennis Schnurr, GKKKS CoconSpiring Defendants, GSS Rommell Coconspiring Defendants, HGG GGF Coconspiring Defendant G Woodall, HOIISS, High School, Jim Neils C Incimnmnati Ohio Police, Jim Neils Tudulizter, KKKFloidss MichaelMichael Listerss, KKKSS, LaSalle Roman Csatholic KKKNazis Abusewrs, Marii Reed, Michelle Michael Kuebler, Sheriff Departrments GGD GGSD Cocospiring Defendants, The St. Joe Real Estate Co. 133 South Water Sound Water Sound Florida 32413, Thomas Hoyer, William Stafford, Williams Staffords, filed by Jrafto Antio Parker David Alexander Muina. (bjc)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 02/19/2020. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: civil cover sheet, copies of the complaint, summons forms and USM-285 Forms) by Plaintiff Jrafto Antio Parker David Alexander Muina. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Envelope) (bjc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jrafto Antio Parker David Alexander Muina v. The St. Joe Real Estate Co. 133 South Water Sound Water Sound Florida 32413 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The St. Joe Real Estate Co. 133 South Water Sound Water Sound Florida 32413
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Hoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asssitant D.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Staffords
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HGG GGF Coconspiring Defendant G Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Neils C Incimnmnati Ohio Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marii Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Schnurr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis Schnurr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KKKSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaSalle Roman Csatholic KKKNazis Abusewrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOIISS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KKKFloidss MichaelMichael Listerss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSS Rommell Coconspiring Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GKKKS CoconSpiring Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Neils Tudulizter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Michael Kuebler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Departrments GGD GGSD Cocospiring Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Clinton of 77 Water Sound New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Clitnon of 77 Water Sound New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jrafto Antio Parker David Alexander Muina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?