Mr. Excavator, Inc. v. Cincinnati Insurance Co. et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Excavator, Inc.
Defendant: Black Horse Construction, LLC and Cincinnati Insurance Co.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00304
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Mr. Excavator, Inc.. (Evenchik, Aaron)
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Black Horse Construction, LLC. (Santin, Teresa)
June 5, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Black Horse Construction, LLC. (Santin, Teresa)
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa G. Santin for Defendant Black Horse Construction, LLC (Santin, Teresa)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #9 Defendant Black Horse Construction LLC's First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint. Black Horse Construction, LLC answer due 6/5/2020; Cincinnati Insurance Co. answer due 6/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 5/20/2020. (km)
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint New date requested 6/5/2020. / Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move or Plead by Defendant Black Horse Construction, LLC. (Merklin, Marc)
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc B Merklin for Defendant Black Horse Construction, LLC (Merklin, Marc)
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Co.. Cincinnati Insurance Co. served on 5/5/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service) (Evenchik, Aaron)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Cincinnati Insurance Co.. (eh)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Black Horse Construction, LLC. Black Horse Construction, LLC served on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Evenchik, Aaron)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Amended Summons (Evenchik, Aaron)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 4/16/2020. (jlw)
April 15, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cincinnati Insurance Co.. (jlw)
April 15, 2020 If this case if referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7424398), filed by Mr. Excavator, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form) (Evenchik, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mr. Excavator, Inc. v. Cincinnati Insurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Excavator, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Steven Evenchik
Represented By: David M. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Horse Construction, LLC
Represented By: Marc B Merklin
Represented By: Teresa G. Santin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?