Pendergraff v. Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tanja Pendergraf and Tanja Pendergraff
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00366
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated per #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (sct)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Tanja Pendergraff (Hymore, Ryan)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #5 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Stay Case Pending Arbitration. The parties shall submit status reports by email to chambers at cole_chambers@oshd.uscourts.gov every 180 days during the pendency of the stay. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 6/4/20. (sct)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending Arbitration by Plaintiff Tanja Pendergraff. (Hymore, Ryan)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.. Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc. served on 5/13/2020, answer due 6/3/2020. (bjc)
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing: A summons and complaint have been sent via certified mail by the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio on May 11, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (jlw)
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc. (eh)
May 8, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7456778), filed by Tanja Pendergraf. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Hymore, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pendergraff v. Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanja Pendergraf
Represented By: Ryan Keith Hymore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanja Pendergraff
Represented By: Ryan Keith Hymore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?