O'Brien Enterprises, LLC et al v. B&B Franchising LLC et al
Plaintiff: A&A Enterprises, LLC and O'Brien Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Jani-King Franchising, Inc., Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King, Inc. and B&B Franchising LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00466
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 13 RULE 26(f) REPORT JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiffs A&A Enterprises, LLC, O'Brien Enterprises, LLC. (Harman, David)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David C Harman for Plaintiffs A&A Enterprises, LLC, O'Brien Enterprises, LLC (Harman, David)
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Count IV of Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint filed by Plaintiffs A&A Enterprises, LLC, O'Brien Enterprises, LLC. (Abaray, Janet)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Jani-King Franchising, Inc.. (Sayre, Russell)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Jani-King, Inc.. (Sayre, Russell)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Jani-King International, Inc.. (Sayre, Russell)
July 17, 2020 Notice of Correction re: Notice of Hearing: Please be aware that the Notice issued setting this matter for a fairness hearing on 11/9/20 was issued in error by the Clerk and should be disregarded. (ba)
July 17, 2020 ****DISREGARD - ISSUED IN ERROR****NOTICE of Hearing: Please be aware that the Fairness Hearing set for 10/5/20 is RESET to 11/9/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 109 - Cincinnati before Judge Michael R. Barrett. (ba) Modified on 7/17/2020 (ba).
July 17, 2020 NOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/7/2020. Please be aware that the Court has revised its Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures; visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of those required forms; (ba)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Count IV of Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint by Defendants Jani-King Franchising, Inc., Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Sayre, Russell)
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, with Jury Demand Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Endorsed Hereon filed by B&B Franchising LLC. (O'Connor, Brian)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Notation order: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiffs' and Jani-King Defendants' filing titled #5 "Stipulation on Answer Date Calculation." The parties assert that their prior 28-day state court stipulation applies in this Court, "[p]ursuant to Civ. R. 82(c)(2)(C), Defendants original answer date was extended by 7 days moving their answer date from June 12 to June 18, and, "[t]hus, Defendants will have up to and including July 16, 2020, to move, answer, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint" in this Court. Id. The Court believes that the parties meant to cite Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 81(c)(2)(C) and does not read that Rule as extending the Jani-King Defendants' answer date by 7 days upon removal. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(2)(C). The Court will construe the parties filing as a joint Motion to Extend the time for the Jani-King Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the Court GRANTS the parties' #5 Motion and the Jani-King Defendants have up to and including July 16, 2016 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 7/8/2020. (ba)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION On Answer Date Calculation by Defendant Jani-King Franchising, Inc.. (Bryan, Beth)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Defendant B&B Franchising LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheets (O'Connor, Brian)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 5/8/2020 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A2001829) by O'Brien Enterprises, LLC, A&A Enterprises, LLC against B&B Franchising LLC, Jani-King Franchising, Inc., Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A-B) (eh)
June 12, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant B&B Franchising LLC. (O'Connor, Brian)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A2001829 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7506934), filed by B&B Franchising LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint & Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Other State Court Filings) (O'Connor, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Brien Enterprises, LLC et al v. B&B Franchising LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jani-King Franchising, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Bryan
Represented By: Russell S Sayre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jani-King International, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Bryan
Represented By: Russell S Sayre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jani-King, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Bryan
Represented By: Russell S Sayre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&B Franchising LLC
Represented By: Brian Patrick O'Connor
Represented By: Michael S Spillane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A&A Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: David C Harman
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O'Brien Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: David C Harman
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?