Pike v. Alliant Capital Management, LLC
Plaintiff: Eileen Pike
Defendant: Alliant Capital Management, LLC doing business as ACM, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00561
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (rrs)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Eileen Pike (Hyslip, Jeffrey)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Eileen Pike (Hyslip, Jeffrey)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Alliant Capital Management, LLC. Alliant Capital Management, LLC served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. (Hyslip, Jeffrey)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alliant Capital Management, LLC. (bjc)
July 20, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Alliant Capital Management, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7561260), filed by Eileen Pike. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Hyslip, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pike v. Alliant Capital Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Pike
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Hyslip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliant Capital Management, LLC doing business as ACM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?