Capital Senior Living, Inc. et al v. Bortz et al
Plaintiff: Capital Senior Living, Inc., CSL Cincinnati, LLC d/b/a The Wellington at North Bend and CSL Cincinnati, LLC d/b/a The Wellington at North Bend doing business as The Wellington at North Bend
Defendant: Debra Oaks, North Bend Senior Living, LLC, Traditions Management, LLC, Robin Hoffman and Stacey Bortz
Case Number: 1:2020cv00562
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew J. Miroff as CO-COUNSEL is this matter only. In the event Pro Hac Vice counsel has not yet received a login and password from the Clerk of Courts, they should promptly comply with the Courts Electronic Filing Policies and Procedures Manual which can be found at the Courts website, www.ohsd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 8/14/20. (eh)
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Defendants Stacey Bortz, Robin Hoffman, North Bend Senior Living, LLC, Debra Oaks, Traditions Management, LLC re #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7604768) of Andrew J. Miroff Certificate of Good Standing - Andrew Miroff (Gilligan, John)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7604768) of Andrew J. Miroff by Defendants Stacey Bortz, Robin Hoffman, North Bend Senior Living, LLC, Debra Oaks, Traditions Management, LLC. (Gilligan, John)
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to North Bend Senior Living, LLC on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Gross, Joseph)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Robin Hoffman on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Gross, Joseph)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Debra Oaks on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Gross, Joseph)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Stacey Bortz on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Gross, Joseph)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick Gilligan for Defendants Stacey Bortz, Robin Hoffman, North Bend Senior Living, LLC, Debra Oaks, Traditions Management, LLC (Gilligan, John)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E. Hepp for Plaintiffs CSL Cincinnati, LLC, Capital Senior Living, Inc. (Hepp, Richard)
July 20, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff CSL Cincinnati, LLC. (Gross, Joseph)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Capital Senior Living, Inc.. (Gross, Joseph)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Stacey Bortz, Robin Hoffman, North Bend Senior Living, LLC, Debra Oaks, Traditions Management, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7561483), filed by Capital Senior Living, Inc., CSL Cincinnati, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Bortz Agreement, #2 Exhibit B- Oaks Agreement, #3 Exhibit C- March 14-letter, #4 Exhibit D- April 11-letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gross, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capital Senior Living, Inc. et al v. Bortz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Oaks
Represented By: Andrew J. Miroff
Represented By: John Patrick Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Bend Senior Living, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Miroff
Represented By: Kishala Srivastava
Represented By: John Patrick Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traditions Management, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Miroff
Represented By: Kishala Srivastava
Represented By: John Patrick Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Hoffman
Represented By: Andrew J. Miroff
Represented By: Kishala Srivastava
Represented By: John Patrick Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Bortz
Represented By: Andrew J. Miroff
Represented By: Kishala Srivastava
Represented By: John Patrick Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital Senior Living, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph N Gross
Represented By: Richard E. Hepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSL Cincinnati, LLC d/b/a The Wellington at North Bend
Represented By: Joseph N Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSL Cincinnati, LLC d/b/a The Wellington at North Bend doing business as The Wellington at North Bend
Represented By: Richard E. Hepp
Represented By: Joseph N Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?