Hughes v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sonya Kay Hughes
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv00625
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #8 Defendant's First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time Until 12/14/2020 in Which to File the Electronic Certified Administrative Record and Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 10/7/2020. (km)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 12/14/2020. by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Julis, Rachel)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge; Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 9/1/20. (ba)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Julis, Rachel)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Julis for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Julis, Rachel)
August 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 10/13/2020. (km)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Sonya Kay Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (km)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 8/14/2020. (km)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sonya Kay Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint) (Fox, Virginia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Kay Hughes
Represented By: Virginia Young Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Rachel Julis
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?